Johnson v. City of Biloxi Municipal Court et al
Plaintiff: Terry Lee Johnson
Defendant: Bob Payne, Justice Court, City of Biloxi Mayor, Harrison County 2nd Judicial and City of Biloxi Municipal Court
Case Number: 1:2019cv00272
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Remark re #32 Letter and #33 Letter. The name on the envelopes is different from the Plaintiff (RLW)
July 3, 2019 Filing 33 Letter from Terry Lee Johnson to Judge Gargiulo (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
July 3, 2019 Filing 32 Letter from Terry Lee Johnson to Judge Gargiulo (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
July 2, 2019 Filing 31 Letter from Terry Lee Johnson to Judge Gargiulo (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
July 1, 2019 Filing 30 Letter from Terry Lee Johnson to Judge Gargiulo (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
June 28, 2019 Filing 29 Letters from Terry Lee Johnson Judge Gargiulo (Attachments: #1 Incident Report, #2 Envelope) (RLW)
June 28, 2019 Filing 28 Letters from Terry Lee Johnson Judge Gargiulo (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
June 27, 2019 Filing 27 Miscellaneous Documents filed by Terry Lee Johnson (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
June 27, 2019 Filing 26 Letter from Terry Lee Johnson to Judge Gargiulo (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
June 27, 2019 Filing 25 Letter from Terry Lee Johnson to Judge Gargiulo (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
June 27, 2019 Filing 24 Letter from Terry Lee Johnson to Judge Gargiulo (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
June 26, 2019 Filing 23 Miscellaneous Documents filed by Terry Lee Johnson (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
June 26, 2019 Filing 22 Letters from Terry Lee Johnson to Judge Gargiulo (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
June 25, 2019 Filing 21 Miscellaneous papers received from Terry Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JCH)
June 24, 2019 Filing 20 Miscellaneous papers received from Terry Lee Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JCH)
June 21, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Terry Lee Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
June 20, 2019 Filing 18 Letter from Terry Lee Johnson to Judge Gargiulo (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
June 19, 2019 Filing 17 Letter from Terry Lee Johnson to Judge Gargiulo (Attachments: #1 Envelope) **The name on the envelope is different from Plaintiff** (RLW)
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 Response to Order re #14 ORDER, filed by Terry Lee Johnson (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 ATTACHMENT re #1 Complaint, by Terry Lee Johnson (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying without prejudice #5 Motion to Challenge Vital Statistics. Plaintiff is required to respond to this Order on or before July 5, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 6/14/2019 (AG)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 Letter from Terry Lee Johnson in regards to case. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JCH)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICES to Summons by Terry Lee Johnson (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 ATTACHMENT re #1 Complaint, by Terry Lee Johnson (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 Miscellaneous documents received from Terry Lee Johnson (RLW)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 Remark: Documents received from Terry Lee Johnson (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 Remark: Documents received from Terry Lee Johnson (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 ATTACHMENT re #1 Complaint, #6 Attachment by Terry Lee Johnson (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 ATTACHMENT re #1 Complaint, by Terry Lee Johnson (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Envelope) (RLW)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Challenge Vital Statistics Records to be Amended to Lawsuit as well as State Relief by Terry Lee Johnson (Attachments: #1 Summonses, #2 Envelope) (RLW)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Terry Lee Johnson regarding case filed and arrest by Gulfport P.D. (Attachments: #1 Municipal Court Documents, #2 Envelope) (PKS)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 5/28/2019 (AG)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Terry Lee Johnson (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Biloxi Mayor, City of Biloxi Municipal Court, Harrison County 2nd Judicial, Justice Court, Bob Payne, filed by Terry Lee Johnson (Attachments: #1 Various Unlabeled Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2019: #3 Notice of Assignment) (RLW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. City of Biloxi Municipal Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justice Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Biloxi Mayor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison County 2nd Judicial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Biloxi Municipal Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Lee Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?