Dobson v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Dobson
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co., State Farm and John and/or Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00273
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosure by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (Wills, Calen)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (Wills, Calen)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Disclosure due by 7/1/2019. Jury Trial set during a three-week term of Court beginning on 7/6/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 806 (Gulfport) Guirola before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 6/24-25/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 806 (Gulfport) Guirola before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Discovery due by 1/7/2020. Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 7/22/2019. Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 7/22/2019. Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 8/5/2019. Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 9/16/2019. Motions due by 1/21/2020. Settlement Conference set for 3/25/2020 09:30 AM in Chambers 870 (Gulfport) Walker before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. ADR Report due by 6/17/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/24/2020. EDT: 3-4 days. Parties do not consent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 6/24/2019 (SR)
June 24, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 6/24/2019 with attorneys James L. Farragut III, John A. Banahan and Calen J. Wills. (SR)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 State Court Record by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (Banahan, John)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Calen J. Wills on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (Wills, Calen)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2019 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR)
May 15, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 2. Attorney is advised that this document should have been filed as an "Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)", which can be found under the "Other Documents" category. The document does not need to be re-filed. (JCH)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co..(Banahan, John)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. from Harrison County Circuit Court - First Judicial District, case number A2401-19-22. (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 14643011335) Lower court jury demand. If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Lower court record)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dobson v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.
Represented By: John A. Banahan
Represented By: Calen J. Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm
Represented By: John A. Banahan
Represented By: Calen J. Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and/or Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Dobson
Represented By: James L. Farragut, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?