Butler v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Doris Jean Butler
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2019cv00279
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Doris Jean Butler., SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Doris Jean Butler. Service made upon: U S Attorney General; (Thomas, Ashley)
June 19, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4 & #5. Attorney's office advised the clerk that there was an error when filing these documents. Please disregard document #4 and #5. Documents will be refiled correctly. (wld)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Doris Jean Butler. Commissioner of Social Security served on 6/3/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. Service made upon: U S Attorney; (Thomas, Ashley)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Doris Jean Butler. Service made upon: U S Attorney; (Thomas, Ashley)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Doris Jean Butler., SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Doris Jean Butler. Service made upon: Commissioner of SSA. (Thomas, Ashley)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 (DISREGARD)SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Doris Jean Butler. Commissioner of Social Security served on 6/10/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. Service made upon: U S Attorney General; (Thomas, Ashley) Modified on 6/19/2019 (wld).
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 (DISREGARD)SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Doris Jean Butler. Doris Jean Butler served on 6/3/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. Service made upon: U S Attorney; (Thomas, Ashley) Modified on 6/19/2019 (wld).
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (wld)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 (Not Signed by Plaintiff)*RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Doris Jean Butler (wld)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Doris Jean Butler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Jean Butler
Represented By: Ashley Brooke Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?