United States of America v. $14,800.00 in United States Currency, et al.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $14,800.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 1:2019cv00293
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Wesley Webb-Federal Gov on behalf of United States of America (Webb-Federal Gov, J.)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM Returned executed as to $14,800 on 5/28/19. (JCH)
May 28, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 3. Scanned document contains blank page. PDFdocuments should be checked for errors before filing. It is not necessary to refile. (JCH)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Warrant of Arrest in Rem Issued as to $14,800.00 in United States Currency. (JCH)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America re #1 Complaint, (Webb-Federal Gov, J.)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America (Webb-Federal Gov, J.)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $14,800.00 in United States Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Consent to Forfeiture or Destruction of Property and Waiver of Notice, #3 Exhibit B - Consent to Forfeiture or Destruction of Property and Waiver of Notice, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Special Agent Todd Key)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $14,800.00 in United States Currency, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $14,800.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: J. Wesley Webb-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?