Bryant v. Errington
Plaintiff: John A. Bryant
Defendant: State of Mississippi and Joe Errington
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv00300
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of document #10 by certified mail Executed as to Jim Hood for Joe Errington, served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (wld)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHER RESPONSIVE PLEADING Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/19/2019 (wld)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REPLACING RESPONDENT: SMCI Superintendent Joe Errington replaces the State of Mississippi as the Respondent. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/17/2019 (wld)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 Response to Order re #6 ORDER filed by John A. Bryant (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wld)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 Response to Order re #6 ORDER filed by John A. Bryant (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(wld)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: on or before July 9, 2019, Petitioner shall file a written response to name his current custodian as the proper Respondent in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/18/2019 (wld)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; *RESTRICTED* granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/18/2019 (wld)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John A. Bryant (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wld)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: on or before July 1, 2019, petitioner shall complete and file the attached application OR pay the $5.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/31/2019 (wld)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John A. Bryant (wld)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by John A. Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Attachments, #2 Envelope, #3 Notice of Assignment)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. Errington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Mississippi
Represented By: Jim Hood-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Errington
Represented By: Jim Hood-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?