Harrington v. Primerica Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Harrington
Defendant: ABC Corporations 1-5, Primerica Life Insurance Company, John Does 1-5 and Jennifer Wheat
Case Number: 1:2019cv00309
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1452
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Additional Time to Serve Defendant Jennifer Wheat. Plaintiff is granted an extension of time until October 19, 2019, to serve Defendant Jennifer Wheat. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 7/17/19 (HM)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Processon Defendant Jennifer Wheat by Jessica Harrington (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Ltr and Summons, #2 Exhibit B-Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit C-Email, #4 Exhibit D-Email, #5 Exhibit E-Email, #6 Exhibit F-Email)(Van Cleave, Christopher)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Primerica Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Primerica, Inc. for Primerica Life Insurance Company. (Hannula, Brian)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Primerica Life Insurance Company (Hannula, Brian)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda (Mandie) B. Robinson on behalf of Primerica Life Insurance Company (Robinson, Amanda (Mandie))
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Primerica Life Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Hancock County, Mississippi, case number 19-0107. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 05384006803) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certified State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B-Wheat Bankruptcy Docket, #3 Exhibit C-Judgment of Divorce, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrington v. Primerica Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Harrington
Represented By: Cory Nathan Ferraez
Represented By: Christopher Collins Van Cleave
Represented By: Christopher C Van Cleave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Amanda (Mandie) B. Robinson
Represented By: Brian B. Hannula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Wheat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?