Ramsey v. Cottle et al

Plaintiff: Katherine Ramsey
Defendant: Larry Wayne Cottle and McCollister's Transportation Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00320
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Larry Wayne Cottle, McCollister's Transportation Group, Inc. (wld)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Katherine Ramsey. McCollister's Transportation Group, Inc. served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Berry, Kelley)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Katherine Ramsey. Larry Wayne Cottle served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Berry, Kelley)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Response to Order re #3 ORDER requiring Plaintiff to file, on or before July 8, 2019, a response that addresses this Court's subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 6/13/2019 (AG) filed by Katherine Ramsey (Berry, Kelley)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Larry Wayne Cottle, McCollister's Transportation Group, Inc., filed by Katherine Ramsey.(Berry, Kelley)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER requiring Plaintiff to file, on or before July 8, 2019, a response that addresses this Court's subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 6/13/2019 (AG)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Larry Wayne Cottle, McCollister's Transportation Group, Inc. (wld)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Larry Wayne Cottle, McCollister's Transportation Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14643011429), filed by Katherine Ramsey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramsey v. Cottle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Wayne Cottle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCollister's Transportation Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Ramsey
Represented By: Kelley M. Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?