Local Union 903 I.B.E.W, Health & Welfare Fund et al v. Brice Electric, LLC

Plaintiff: Local Union 903 I.B.E.W. Pension Trust Fund and Local Union 903 I.B.E.W, Health & Welfare Fund
Defendant: Brice Electric, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00325
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Brice Electric, LLC.(Laird, Henry)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on July 30, 2019 (King, Steve)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 ATTACHMENT re #3 MOTION for Glen Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4031460) Certificate of Good Standing by Local Union 903 I.B.E.W, Health & Welfare Fund, Local Union 903 I.B.E.W. Pension Trust Fund (Quinn, John)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Local Union 903 I.B.E.W, Health & Welfare Fund, Local Union 903 I.B.E.W. Pension Trust Fund. Brice Electric, LLC served on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Quinn, John)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Brice Electric, LLC answer due 8/12/2019. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on July 22, 2019 (King, Steve)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Brice Electric, LLC (Laird, Henry)
July 10, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3: Advising attorney that the COGS should have been attached as an exhibit to the Motion. Attorney is not required to re-file. (RLW)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Glen Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4031460) by Local Union 903 I.B.E.W, Health & Welfare Fund, Local Union 903 I.B.E.W. Pension Trust Fund (Quinn, John)
June 17, 2019 Remark - Original summons mailed to attorney at address on summons via regular us mail. (RLW)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Brice Electric, LLC (RLW)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, with jury demand, against Brice Electric, LLC (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-4013988), filed by Local Union 903 I.B.E.W, Health & Welfare Fund, Local Union 903 I.B.E.W. Pension Trust Fund (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/18/2019) (RLW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Local Union 903 I.B.E.W, Health & Welfare Fund et al v. Brice Electric, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union 903 I.B.E.W. Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: John Lee Quinn
Represented By: Glen M. Connor - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union 903 I.B.E.W, Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: John Lee Quinn
Represented By: Glen M. Connor - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brice Electric, LLC
Represented By: Henry F. Laird, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?