Cook v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: James H. Cook
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00335
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Radicioni, Cory)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James H. Cook. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Ott, Paul)
June 21, 2019 Issued Summons #2 mailed to attorney to address listed on summons/docket. (JCH)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (JCH)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0538-4018807), filed by James H. Cook. Jury trial requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Cory L. Radicioni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H. Cook
Represented By: Paul V. Ott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?