Moore v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Christopher Moore
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc. and BP America Production Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00360
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Parties by James Christopher Moore (Bolen, R.)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER terminating Craig Downs and Nathan Lee Nelson as counsel for Plaintiff. Counsel has not sought pro hac vice admission or filed a motion to voluntarily withdraw, despite being ordered to do so by the Court. Therefore, because counsel has not been admitted to practice before this Court, they will be terminated on the docket. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 8/23/2019 (AG)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles David Durkee. Charles David Durkee is admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiff in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 8/12/2019 (AB)
August 8, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Charles David Durkee, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4056020) by James Christopher Moore (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Bolen, R.)
August 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Michael Bolen on behalf of James Christopher Moore (Bolen, R.)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Attorneys Downs and Nelson have until August 22, 2019 to either file a motion to withdraw or seek pro hac vice admission. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 8/7/2019 (AG)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw Certain Counsel of Record. Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine Pyune McEldowney, and Don Keller Haycraft are terminated as counsel of record for the Defendants. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 7/18/2019 (AG)
July 17, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP Exploration & Production Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP Exploration & Production Inc.. (Tardy, Thomas)
July 17, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP America Production Company identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP America Production Company. (Tardy, Thomas)
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Certain Counsel of Record by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Edderek Linnel Cole on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Cole, Edderek)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Smith Rush on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Rush, Clare)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles (Chan) E. McLeod on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (McLeod, Charles (Chan))
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Tardy, III on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 Letter sent to Don Haycraft, Kevin Hodges, Catherine McEldowney, Craig Downs and Nathan Nelson on 7/2/2019 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (wld)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-13761. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified file date on 7/2/2019 (wld).
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case transferred to District of Southern District of Mississippi: IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 7/1/2019.(mmv) (NEF: HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/2/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/2/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than May 1, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than June 1, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 4/4/2019.(mmv) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/2/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/2/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/2/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/2/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7304357) filed by James Christopher Moore. (Attachments: #1 A-Election Not to Mediate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Craig Downs added to party James Christopher Moore(pty:pla).(Downs, Craig) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/2/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc.
Represented By: Catherine Pyune *McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Don Keller *Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Clare Smith Rush
Represented By: Edderek Linnel Cole
Represented By: Thomas W. Tardy, III
Represented By: Charles (Chan) E. McLeod
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Catherine Pyune *McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Don Keller *Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Clare Smith Rush
Represented By: Edderek Linnel Cole
Represented By: Thomas W. Tardy, III
Represented By: Charles (Chan) E. McLeod
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Christopher Moore
Represented By: Craig Downs
Represented By: Nathan Lee Nelson - PHV
Represented By: R. Michael Bolen
Represented By: Charles David Durkee - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?