Humphrey v. Hall et al
Plaintiff: Omar Khayyam Humphrey
Defendant: Pelicia Hall, Joshua Csaszar, Regina Reed, Joe Errington, James Cooksey, Parveen Kumar, Sheneice Hartfield-Evans, Joseph Cooley, Marquis Lindsey, Richard Pennington, Andrian Keys, Penny Bufkin, Ronald Woodall, Roylandia McBride and Andrew Mills
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv00362
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Mario T. Rucker filed by Omar Khayyam Humphrey (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
August 7, 2019 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Woodall, Kumar and Lindsey on 8/7/19. Waiver of Service due by 9/9/2019. (RLW)
August 7, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Hall, Errington, Csaszar, Reed, Bufkin, Cooksey, Cooley, Hartfield-Evans, McBride, Mills, Keys and Pennington on 8/7/19. Waiver of Service due by 9/9/2019 (RLW)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Clerk is directed to issue a Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons for the Defendants. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 8/7/19 (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons Form to Hall, Errington, Csaszar, Reed, Bufkin, Cooksey, Cooley, Hartfield-Evans, McBride, Mills, Keys and Pennington, #2 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons Form to Woodall, Kumar and Lindsey, #3 Waiver of the Service of Summons Form) (RLW)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 8/7/19. (RLW)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Produce as premature. Discovery is stayed until further Order of the Court; granting #8 Motion to Amend/Correct to the extent the Court will consider the allegations within the pleading and allow Dr. Ronald Woodall, Dr. Parveen Kumar, and Dr. Marquis Lindsey to be added as Defendants. The Clerk is directed to edit the docket accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 8/6/19. (RLW)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Clerk is directed to mail copies of this Order to the plaintiff; and Premier Supply Link for MDOC Inmate Accounts, P.O. Box 97538, Pearl, Mississippi 39288. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 8/6/19. (RLW)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing of Documents by Omar Khayyam Humphrey (Attachments: #1 1- Affidavits, #2 2 - APR Request, #3 3 - First Step ARP Response, #4 4 - MDOC Offender Request Form, #5 5 - MDOC Offender Request Form, #6 6 - Memo, #7 Envelope) (RLW)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 ATTACHMENT re #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Omar Khayyam Humphrey (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Omar Khayyam Humphrey (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #6 Order Opsp2. Acknowledgement filed by Omar Khayyam Humphrey (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Omar Khayyam Humphrey (Attachments: #1 News Article, #2 Envelope) (RLW)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER The plaintiff shall file within 30 days of the date of this order a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 7/10/19. (RLW)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 8/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 7/10/19. (RLW)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 (Copy) MOTION to Produce Documents to Defendant Hall by Omar Khayyam Humphrey (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 (Copy) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Omar Khayyam Humphrey (Attachments: #1 Letter to Attorney Jody Owens, #2 Envelope) (RLW)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 AUTHORIZATION FOR RELEASE OF ACCOUNT INFORMATION AND CERTIFICATE by Omar Khayyam Humphrey (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 (Unsigned) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #1 Complaint filed by Omar Khayyam Humphrey (Attachments: #1 Various Unlabeled Documents, #2 Envelope) (RLW)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joshua Csaszar, Joe Errington, Pelicia Hall, Regina Reed, filed by Omar Khayyam Humphrey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PLRA, #2 Various Unlabeled Documents, #3 Envelope, #4 Notice of Assignment) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humphrey v. Hall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelicia Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Csaszar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Errington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cooksey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parveen Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheneice Hartfield-Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquis Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrian Keys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny Bufkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Woodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roylandia McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Khayyam Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?