Arc Controls, Inc. v. M/V Nor Goliath et al
Plaintiff: Arc Controls, Inc.
Petitioner: Redfish Rentals, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: M/V Nor Goliath and Goliath Offshore Holdings, Pte. Ltd.
Intervenor Plaintiff: DHD Offshore Services, LLC, Cypress Pipeline and Process Services, LLC, Atlas Decorative Concrete, LLC, Fugro USA Marine, Inc., Bishop's Lifting Products, Inc., International Marine & Engineering Services Jersey Limited, Curtin Maritime Corporation, Versabar, Inc., Oceanwide Cyprus, Ltd., C-Mar America, Inc. and MARMAC, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Epic Companies, LLC
Consolidated Plaintiff: Dan Bunkering (America) Inc.
Consolidated Defendant: Epic Applied Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00391
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 119 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arc Controls, Inc. (Betbeze - PHV, Jaime)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #112 Motion for Leave to File Complaint in Intervention. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on September 6, 2019 (King, Steve)
August 30, 2019 Filing 118 MOTION to Modify Arrest to Permit Vessel Movement (Expedited) by Goliath Offshore Holdings, Pte. Ltd., M/V Nor Goliath (Wyly, James)
August 30, 2019 Filing 117 RESPONSE to Motion re #103 MOTION to Modify Arrest to Return Third-Party Equipment filed by Fugro USA Marine, Inc. (Knister, Terrence)
August 30, 2019 Filing 116 RESPONSE in Opposition re #103 MOTION to Modify Arrest to Return Third-Party Equipment Plaintiff's Partial Objection to Defendants' Motion to Modify Arrest filed by Arc Controls, Inc. (Betbeze - PHV, Jaime)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #113 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #114 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on August 30, 2019 (King, Steve)
August 29, 2019 Filing 114 MOTION for Conor T. Lutkewitte to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4076823) by Redfish Rentals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Louisiana Supreme Court)(Salloum, Richard)
August 29, 2019 Filing 113 MOTION for Thomas J. Lutkewitte to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4076816) by Redfish Rentals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Louisiana Supreme Court)(Salloum, Richard)
August 29, 2019 Filing 112 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint In Intervention by Redfish Rentals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposed Verified Complaint in Intervention with contracts, delivery tickets, and invoices)(Salloum, Richard)
August 27, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 110. L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (JCH)
August 27, 2019 Filing 111 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by DHD Offshore Services, LLC (Stevens, Scott)
August 27, 2019 Filing 110 Intervenor COMPLAINT against the M/V NOR GOLIATH, filed by DHD Offshore Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Stevens, Scott)
August 27, 2019 Filing 109 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cypress Pipeline and Process Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cypress Energy Investments, LLC, Corporate Parent Cypress Energy Holdings, LLC for Cypress Pipeline and Process Services, LLC. (McCabe, Michael)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #105 Motion for Leave to File a Verified Complaint in Intervention filed by DHD Offshore Services, LLC Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 8/27/2019. (SR)
August 27, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 105. Proposed orders are not to be electronically filed as a separate pleading or as an attachment to a pleading, but instead are to be provided to chambers by e-mail (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec.5.B.). (JCH)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER re NOR GOLIATH and Goliath Offshore Holdings's #103 Motion to Modify Arrest. Any party objecting to the relief sought therein shall file a response outlining the basis for such objection by 9/2/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 8/26/2019 (MG)
August 26, 2019 Filing 107 U.S. Marshal's Return executed as to M/V Nor Goliath. (JCH)
August 26, 2019 Filing 106 U.S. Marshal's Return executed as to M/V Nor Goliath. (JCH)
August 26, 2019 Filing 105 MOTION for Leave to File a Verified Complaint in Intervention by DHD Offshore Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment Verified Complaint in Intervention, #2 Exhibit A to Verified Complaint in Intervention, #3 Exhibit B to Verified Complaint in Intervention, #4 Exhibit C to Verified Complaint in Intervention, #5 Attachment Proposed Order)(Stevens, Scott)
August 23, 2019 Filing 104 MEMORANDUM in Support re #103 MOTION to Modify Arrest to Return Third-Party Equipment filed by Goliath Offshore Holdings, Pte. Ltd., M/V Nor Goliath (Wyly, James)
August 23, 2019 Filing 103 MOTION to Modify Arrest to Return Third-Party Equipment by Goliath Offshore Holdings, Pte. Ltd., M/V Nor Goliath (Wyly, James)
August 22, 2019 Filing 102 Summons Issued as to Epic Applied Technologies, LLC, Epic Companies, LLC. (JCH)
August 21, 2019 Filing 101 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fugro USA Marine, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Fugro USA Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Fugro Consultants International N.V., Corporate Parent Fugro N.V. for Fugro USA Marine, Inc.. (Knister, Terrence)
August 19, 2019 Filing 100 Supplemental Warrant for Arrest in Rem Issued as to M/V Nor Goliath. (JCH)
August 16, 2019 Filing 99 Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by Atlas Decorative Concrete, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Invoice)(Armer, Tristan)
August 16, 2019 Filing 98 Supplemental Warrant for Arrest in Rem Issued as to M/V Nor Goliath. (JCH)
August 16, 2019 Filing 97 Supplemental Warrant of Arrest in Rem Issued as to M/V Nor Goliath. (JCH)
August 15, 2019 Filing 96 Warrant for Arrest in Rem Issued as to M/V Nor Goliath. (JCH)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #93 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 8/14/2019 (SR)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #84 Motion to Intervene by ATLAS DECORATIVE CONCRETE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 8/14/2019 (SR)
August 14, 2019 Filing 93 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Bishop's Lifting Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Warrant of Arrest in rem)(Peacocke, Lee)
August 14, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 89 and # 91. Proposed summons should be delivered to the Clerk for issuance along with a self addressed stamped envelope, not submitted by filing a generic Notice on ECF. Both of these entries will be disregarded on the docket. (JCH)
August 14, 2019 Filing 92 Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by Bishop's Lifting Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Master Equipment Rental Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2- Adoption of Master Equipment Rental Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3- Out Items Report, #4 Exhibit 4- Rental Contracts Set 1, #5 Exhibit 5- Rental Contracts Set 2, #6 Exhibit 6- Rental Contracts Set 3, #7 Exhibit 7- Rental Contracts Set 4, #8 Exhibit Verification)(Peacocke, Lee)
August 14, 2019 Filing 91 **DISREGARD**NOTICE of Filing and Issurance of Summons by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. (Guy - PHV, Matthew) Modified on 8/14/2019 (JCH).
August 14, 2019 Filing 90 Intervenor COMPLAINT Against Defendant-in-Intervention, M/V NOR GOLIATH, filed by Fugro USA Marine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fugro Invoices, #2 Exhibit B - List of Equipment)(Knister, Terrence)
August 14, 2019 Filing 89 **DISREGARD**NOTICE of Filing and Issuance of Summons by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Guy - PHV, Matthew) Modified on 8/14/2019 (JCH).
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #82 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem of M/V NOR GOLIATH. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on August 14, 2019 (King, Steve)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #80 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on August 14, 2019 (King, Steve)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #75 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Complaint in Intervention. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on August 14, 2019 (King, Steve)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Publication of Notice of Attachment, Rule C(4). Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on August 14, 2019 (King, Steve)
August 13, 2019 Filing 84 MOTION to Intervene by Atlas Decorative Concrete, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint to Intervene)(Armer, Tristan)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #77 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #78 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #79 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on August 13, 2019 (King, Steve)
August 12, 2019 Filing 82 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem of M/V NOR GOLIATH by C-Mar America, Inc., International Marine & Engineering Services Jersey Limited (Thompson, Michael)
August 12, 2019 Filing 81 Intervenor COMPLAINT against M/V NOR GOLIATH in rem, filed by International Marine & Engineering Services Jersey Limited, C-Mar America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Combined Invoices for Crew Services, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Verification Executed by Ron Murray)(Thompson, Michael)
August 9, 2019 Filing 80 MOTION to Intervene by Bishop's Lifting Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint in Intervention, #2 Exhibit Master Equipment Rental Agreement, #3 Exhibit Adoption of Master Equipment Rental Agreement, #4 Exhibit Out Items Report, #5 Exhibit Rental Contracts Set 1, #6 Exhibit Rental Contracts Set 2, #7 Exhibit Rental Contracts Set 3, #8 Exhibit Rental Contracts Set 4, #9 Exhibit Verification)(Peacocke, Lee)
August 9, 2019 Filing 79 MOTION for Zachary J. Ardoin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4056578) by Goliath Offshore Holdings, Pte. Ltd., M/V Nor Goliath (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of the State of Louisiana 07.29.2019)(Wyly, James)
August 9, 2019 Filing 78 MOTION for Joseph Edward Lee, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4056573) by Goliath Offshore Holdings, Pte. Ltd., M/V Nor Goliath (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of the State of Louisiana 07.29.2019)(Wyly, James)
August 9, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by Miles P. Clements $ 100, receipt number 0538-4056482 (JCH)
August 9, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION for Miles Paul Clements to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Goliath Offshore Holdings, Pte. Ltd., M/V Nor Goliath (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of the State of Louisiana 07.29.2019)(Wyly, James)
August 9, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 75. L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (JCH)
August 9, 2019 Filing 76 ATTACHMENT re #75 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Complaint in Intervention - Verification to the Proposed Complaint in Intervention by Fugro USA Marine, Inc. (Knister, Terrence)
August 9, 2019 Filing 75 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Complaint in Intervention by Fugro USA Marine, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Knister, Terrence)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #69 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #70 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #71 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on August 8, 2019 (King, Steve)
August 7, 2019 Filing 73 AMENDED COMPLAINT and (Supplemental) in Intervention against M/V Nor Goliath, filed by Curtin Maritime Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Charter Documents, #2 Exhibit "B" - Invoices, #3 Exhibit "C" - Fuel Invoices, #4 Attachment Verification Signed by Kelly Curtin)(Dragna, Gerard)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #67 Motion for Leave to File Verified First Amended and Supplemental Complaint in Intervention. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on August 7, 2019 (King, Steve)
August 6, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by James E. Rogers $100.00, receipt number 14643011581 (RLW)
August 6, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by Scott D. Marrs $100.00, receipt number 14643011581 (RLW)
August 6, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by Brian T. Bagley $100.00, receipt number 14643011581 (RLW)
August 6, 2019 Filing 71 MOTION for James E. Rogers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cypress Pipeline and Process Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(McCabe, Michael)
August 6, 2019 Filing 70 MOTION for Scott D. Marrs to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cypress Pipeline and Process Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(McCabe, Michael)
August 6, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION for Brian T. Bagley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cypress Pipeline and Process Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(McCabe, Michael)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #66 Motion for Leave to File Verified Complaint in Intervention. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on August 6, 2019 (King, Steve)
August 6, 2019 Filing 67 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Verified First Amended and Supplemental Complaint in Intervention by Curtin Maritime Corporation (Attachments: #1 Attachment Verified First Amended and Supplemental Complaint in Intervention, #2 Exhibit "A" Charter Documents, #3 Exhibit "B" Invoices, #4 Exhibit "C" Fuel Invoices, #5 Attachment Verification Signed by Kelly Curtin)(Dragna, Gerard)
August 5, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to File Verified Complaint in Intervention by C-Mar America, Inc., International Marine & Engineering Services Jersey Limited (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verified Complaint in Intervention, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A: Invoices and Supporting Documents, #3 Exhibit Verification)(Thompson, Michael)
July 31, 2019 Filing 65 U.S. Marshal's Return executed as to M/V Nor Goliath. (JCH)
July 31, 2019 Filing 64 U.S. Marshal's Return executed as to M/V Nor Goliath. (JCH)
July 31, 2019 Filing 63 U.S. Marshal's Return executed as to M/V Nor Goliath. (JCH)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #55 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on July 31, 2019 (King, Steve) (JCH).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #49 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #50 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on July 31, 2019 (King, Steve)
July 30, 2019 Filing 60 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M/V Nor Goliath, Goliath Offshore Holdings, Pte. Ltd.. Epic Companies, LLC served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Wyly, James)
July 30, 2019 Filing 59 Warrant for Arrest in Rem Issued as to M/V Nor Goliath. (JCH)
July 30, 2019 Filing 58 Warrant for Arrest in Rem Issued as to M/V Nor Goliath. (JCH)
July 30, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard J. Dragna on behalf of MARMAC, LLC (Dragna, Gerard)
July 30, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard J. Dragna on behalf of Curtin Maritime Corporation (Dragna, Gerard)
July 29, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for Matthew Charles Guy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4046851) by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Louisiana Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Texas Certificate of Good Standing)(Parrott, George)
July 26, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 51. Attorney is advised that Oceanwide Texas, Inc. is listed below the signature line, but they are not a party to this case. Only the applicable filer/party should be listed. Attorney does not need to re-file. (JCH)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Permit Vessel Movement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on July 26, 2019 (King, Steve)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: Ordered that 1:19cv395 HSO-JCG is consolidated with 1:19cv391 LG-RHW. All further pleadings shall be filed in 1:19cv391 LG-RHW. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 7/26/19. (JCH)
July 26, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION Motion for Publication of Notice of Attachment, Rule C(4) by Arc Controls, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Arrest of Vessel and Notice for Claims)(Betbeze - PHV, Jaime)
July 26, 2019 Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oceanwide Cyprus, Ltd. (Kavanagh, John)
July 26, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for Susan G. Keller-Garcia to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4045712) by Bishop's Lifting Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Peacocke, Lee)
July 26, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for Joseph P. Tynan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4045700) by Bishop's Lifting Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Peacocke, Lee)
July 26, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 48. 1.) L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. 2.) Attorney's office did not add their party correctly. Clerk's office modified the party to add them as an interested party, not a defendant. Clerk also added the attorney listed on the Statement of Interest as the attorney for Bishop's Lifting Products, Inc. (JCH)
July 25, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Statement of Interest by Bishop's Lifting Products, Inc., d/b/a Morgan City Rentals and Delta Rigging & Tools re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Peacocke, Lee)
July 25, 2019 Filing 47 U.S. Marshal's Return executed as to M/V Nor Goliath. (JCH)
July 25, 2019 Filing 46 U.S. Marshal's Return executed as to M/V Nor Goliath. (JCH)
July 24, 2019 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion re #38 MOTION to Permit Vessel Movement (Expedited) filed by Goliath Offshore Holdings, Pte. Ltd., M/V Nor Goliath (Wyly, James)
July 24, 2019 Filing 44 Warrant for Arrest in Rem Issued as to M/V Nor Goliath. (JCH)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem of M/V NOR GOLIATH. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on July 24, 2019 (King, Steve)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem of M/V NOR GOLIATH. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on July 24, 2019 (King, Steve)
July 23, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Permit Vessel Movement (Expedited) Plaintiff's Objection to Expedited Motion to Permit Vessel Movement filed by Arc Controls, Inc. (Betbeze - PHV, Jaime)
July 23, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem of M/V NOR GOLIATH by Curtin Maritime Corporation (Mouledoux - PHV, Andre)
July 23, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem of M/V NOR GOLIATH by MARMAC, LLC (Mouledoux - PHV, Andre)
July 23, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Permit Vessel Movement (Expedited) by Goliath Offshore Holdings, Pte. Ltd., M/V Nor Goliath (Wyly, James)
July 23, 2019 Filing 37 Third Party Summons Issued as to Epic Companies, LLC. (JCH)
July 23, 2019 Filing 36 ATTACHMENT re #30 Intervenor Complaint Verification Executed by Pat Stant by MARMAC, LLC (Mouledoux - PHV, Andre)
July 23, 2019 Filing 35 ATTACHMENT re #17 Intervenor Complaint Verification Executed by Philip Rundle by Versabar, Inc. (Mouledoux - PHV, Andre)
July 23, 2019 Filing 34 Intervenor COMPLAINT in Intervention, filed by Curtin Maritime Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Charter Docs, #2 Exhibit "B" Invoice, #3 Exhibit Verification Signed by Kelly Curtin)(Mouledoux - PHV, Andre)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Leave to File Verified Complaint in Intervention by Curtin Maritime Corporation Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 7/22/2019. (SR)
July 22, 2019 Filing 32 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Verified Complaint in Intervention by Curtin Maritime Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Veritifed Complaint in Intervention, #2 Exhibit "A" Charter Docs, #3 Exhibit "B" Invoice, #4 Exhibit Verification Signed by Kelly Curtin)(Mouledoux - PHV, Andre)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on July 22, 2019 (King, Steve)
July 22, 2019 Filing 30 Intervenor COMPLAINT (Verified), filed by MARMAC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Charter Documents, #2 Exhibit "B" Invoices)(Mouledoux - PHV, Andre)
July 19, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Jaime W. Betbeze to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Arc Controls, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Cox, Herman)
July 19, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to PHV fee paid on 7/19/19. PHV attorneys should not pay the fee themselves on ECF, but local counsel should pay the fee and file the proper Application for Pro Hac Admission (Form 6). Attorney is advised that we will retain the $100 fee, but local counsel is reminded to file the Application under their login and not pay a duplicate $100 filing fee. (JCH)
July 19, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Jaime W. Betbeze receipt number 0538-4040353 $ 100 (Betbeze - PHV, Jaime)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to File Verified Complaint in Intervention by MARMAC, LLC Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 7/19/2019. (SR)
July 19, 2019 Filing 27 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Verified Complaint in Intervention by MARMAC, LLC (Attachments: #1 Verified Complaint in Intervention, #2 Exhibit "A" Charter Documents, #3 Exhibit "B" Invoices, #4 Exhibit Verification Signed by Pat Stant)(Mouledoux - PHV, Andre)
July 19, 2019 Filing 26 U.S. Marshal's Return executed as to M/V Nor Goliath. (JCH)
July 19, 2019 Filing 25 Supplemental Warrant for Arrest in Rem Issued as to M/V Nor Goliath. (JCH)
July 19, 2019 Filing 24 Supplemental Warrant for Arrest in Rem Issued as to M/V Nor Goliath. (JCH)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion Authorizing Issuance of Warrant of Arrest of the M/V NOR GOLIATH re #17 Intervenor Complaint by Versabar, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 7/19/2019 (SR)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Andre J. Mouledoux and Trevor M. Cutaiar shall be admitted pro hac vice to serve as co-counsel for the intervenor plaintiff Versabar, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on July 19, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
July 19, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION Authorizing Issuance of Warrant of Arrest of the M/V NOR GOLIATH re #17 Intervenor Complaint by Versabar, Inc. (Dragna, Gerard)
July 19, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Withdrawal by Oceanwide Cyprus, Ltd. re #16 MOTION to Withdraw #14 Application for Warrant of Arrest in Rem , #14 Application for Warrant of Arrest in Rem (Kavanagh, John)
July 19, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Trevor M. Cutaiar to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4039831) by Versabar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Dragna, Gerard)
July 19, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Andre J. Mouledoux to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4039770) by Versabar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Dragna, Gerard)
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 Intervenor COMPLAINT in Intervention, filed by Versabar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Versabar Invoices)(Dragna, Gerard)
July 19, 2019 Filing 16 **WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE FILED ON 7/19/19** MOTION to Withdraw #14 Application for Warrant of Arrest in Rem by Oceanwide Cyprus, Ltd. (Kavanagh, John) Modified on 7/19/2019 (JCH).
July 19, 2019 Filing 15 Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by Cypress Pipeline and Process Services, LLC.(McCabe, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 **WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE FILED ON 7/19/2019**APPLICATION WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by Oceanwide Cyprus, Ltd. (Kavanagh, John) Modified on 7/19/2019 (JCH).
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by Oceanwide Cyprus, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Oceanwides Invoices)(Kavanagh, John)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #12 unopposed Motion to Intervene. Cypress Pipeline and Process Services, LLC is granted leave to file complaint in intervention. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on July 19, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Cypress Pipeline and Process Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint in Intervention)(McCabe, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to File Verified Complaint in Intervention. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 7/18/2019 (SR)
July 18, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 10. Clerk's office has deleted Epic Companies, LLC as a Defendant in this case, they should only be listed as a Third Party Defendant. (JCH)
July 18, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 9. Clerk's office has changed the party role of Versabar, Inc. from Plaintiff to Movant. This party is not a Plaintiff and the Motion to Intervene is still pending, therefore the party will be listed as a Movant until there is an Order on record allowing them to intervene, which at that time the party will be changed to an Intervenor Plaintiff. (JCH)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Epic Companies, LLC by Goliath Offshore Holdings, Pte. Ltd., M/V Nor Goliath. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Guarantee (dated 18 April 2019))(Wyly, James)
July 17, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 9. 1.) L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. 2.) Proposed orders are not to be electronically filed as a separate pleading or as an attachment to a pleading, but instead are to be provided to chambers by e-mail (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec.5.B.). (JCH)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Complaint in Intervention by Versabar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Verified Complaint of Intervention, #3 Exhibit "A", #4 Verification of Philip Rundle, #5 Motion for Order Authorizing Issuance of Warrant of Arrest, #6 Warrant for Arrest)(Dragna, Gerard)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Permit Shifting of Vessel, If Necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 7/12/19. (JCH)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION Emergency Motion to Permit Shifting of Vessel, If Necessary by Arc Controls, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Marine Safety Information Bulletin)(Cox, Herman)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appoint Custodian. U.S. Maritime Services, LLC appointed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 7/12/19. (JCH)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Warrant for Arrest in Rem Issued as to M/V Nor Goliath. (JCH)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 7/12/19. (JCH)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Custodian by Arc Controls, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Substitute Custodian)(Cox, Herman)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Arc Controls, Inc. (Cox, Herman)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Goliath Offshore Holdings, Pte. Ltd., M/V Nor Goliath (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0538-4033981), filed by Arc Controls, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Epic Companies LLC purchase order, #3 Exhibit B - Arc Controls invoice)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arc Controls, Inc. v. M/V Nor Goliath et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arc Controls, Inc.
Represented By: Herman F. Cox, Jr.
Represented By: Jaime W. Betbeze - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: M/V Nor Goliath
Represented By: James G. Wyly, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Goliath Offshore Holdings, Pte. Ltd.
Represented By: James G. Wyly, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: DHD Offshore Services, LLC
Represented By: Scott D. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Cypress Pipeline and Process Services, LLC
Represented By: Scott D. Marrs - PHV
Represented By: James E. Rogers - PHV
Represented By: Michael Clark McCabe, Jr.
Represented By: Brian T. Bagley - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Atlas Decorative Concrete, LLC
Represented By: Tristan Russell Armer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Fugro USA Marine, Inc.
Represented By: Terrence Kent Knister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Bishop's Lifting Products, Inc.
Represented By: Susan G. Keller-Garcia - PHV
Represented By: Lee Morgan Peacocke
Represented By: Joseph P. Tynan - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: International Marine & Engineering Services Jersey Limited
Represented By: Michael J. Thompson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Curtin Maritime Corporation
Represented By: Andre J. Mouledoux - PHV
Represented By: Gerard J. Dragna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Versabar, Inc.
Represented By: Trevor M. Cutaiar - PHV
Represented By: Andre J. Mouledoux - PHV
Represented By: Gerard J. Dragna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Oceanwide Cyprus, Ltd.
Represented By: John P. Kavanagh, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: C-Mar America, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Thompson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: MARMAC, LLC
Represented By: Andre J. Mouledoux - PHV
Represented By: Gerard J. Dragna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Redfish Rentals, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Lutkewitte - PHV
Represented By: Richard P. Salloum
Represented By: Conor T. Lutkewitte - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Epic Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Dan Bunkering (America) Inc.
Represented By: George Robert Parrott, II
Represented By: Matthew Charles Guy - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Epic Applied Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?