Bentley v. USIC Locating Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Deshawna Bentley
Defendant: Joseph Brinklow and USIC Locating Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00396
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Reset Hearing: Due to a conflict with Defense Counsel's schedule, the Telephonic Case Management Conference is RESET (TIME CHANGE ONLY) for 11/22/2019 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. (AB)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USIC Locating Services, LLC (Taylor, Edward)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/22/2019 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. (AB)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deshawna Bentley. Joseph Brinklow served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Altman, Kenneth)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Joseph Brinklow, USIC Locating Services, LLC.(Taylor, Edward)
July 25, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline: USIC Locating Services, LLC answer due 8/12/2019. (PKS)
July 25, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #6: Summons returned executed date in docket text is 7/20/19 and should be 7/22/19. Answer due date will be reset. (PKS)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deshawna Bentley. USIC Locating Services, LLC served on 7/20/2019, answer due 8/10/2019. (Altman, Kenneth) Modified on 7/25/2019 to correct answer due date(PKS).
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #4 Order of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Deshawna Bentley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Articles of Entity, #2 Exhibit 2 - Annual Report, #3 Exhibit 3 - Public Records Search)(Altman, Kenneth)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring Plaintiff to file, on or before August 12, 2019, a response that correctly addresses this Court's subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 7/18/2019 (AG)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Joseph Brinklow, USIC Locating Services, LLC. (JCH)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* DOCUMENT - Unredacted Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 REDACTED COMPLAINT against Joseph Brinklow, USIC Locating Services, LLC (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 14643011519), filed by Deshawna Bentley. Jury trial requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bentley v. USIC Locating Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Brinklow
Represented By: Edward Coleman Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USIC Locating Services, LLC
Represented By: Edward Coleman Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deshawna Bentley
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?