Jordan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Constance Lynn Jordan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2019cv00415
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Constance Lynn Jordan. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/3/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. Service made upon: U S Attorney General; Commissioner of SSA. (RLW)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Constance Lynn Jordan. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/30/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. Service made upon: U S Attorney. (RLW)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (JCH)
August 15, 2019 Remark: Plaintiff is represented by counsel, therefore, per #5 Order summonses were mailed to counsel, Franklin Alan Garrison, on behalf of Plaintiff via regular us mail. (RLW) Modified on 8/15/2019 (RLW).
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE BY U.S. MARSHAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 8/14/19 (CCO)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and DIRECTING CLERK. The U.S. District Clerk is hereby authorized to receive and file the Complaint in this action without prepayment of fees or costs. The Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff summons forms, and Plaintiff is directed to complete and return the summons forms, within 20 days of the date of this order. Upon receipt of the completed summons forms, the Clerk shall issue process for service on the Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 8/14/19 (CCO)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING THE FILING OF BRIEFS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 8/12/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Karl E. Osterhout admitted upon payment of fee. NO WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 7/29/2019. (ACF)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Karl E. Osterhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4045996) by Constance Lynn Jordan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Western District of PA, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Supreme Court of PA, #3 Exhibit List of Supplemental Court Admissions)(Garrison, Franklin)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Constance Lynn Jordan (RLW)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Constance Lynn Jordan (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Lynn Jordan
Represented By: Franklin Alan Garrison
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?