Meyers v. Ngirablosch et al
Plaintiff: Rita Lynette Meyers
Defendant: Enrilley M. Kiuluul, John Doe, USAA General Indemnity Company and Lannette T. Ngirablosch
Case Number: 1:2019cv00420
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Sever filed by USAA General Indemnity Company (Sterling, Timothy)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Sever Non diverse defendants filed by Rita Lynette Meyers (Jacobs, Catherine)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Sever Non diverse defendants filed by Rita Lynette Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A USAA Policy, #2 Exhibit B Accident report, #3 Exhibit C Letter denying coverage)(Jacobs, Catherine)
August 28, 2019 Docket Annotation as to Doc. #8. L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney does not need to refile but is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (wld)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing of returns on state court summons for Enrilley Kiulull and Lannette Ngirablosch by Rita Lynette Meyers re #3 State Court Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jacobs, Catherine)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Sever filed by USAA General Indemnity Company (Sterling, Timothy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Sever by USAA General Indemnity Company (Sterling, Timothy)
August 20, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 4 - # 5. Attorney should prepare a Notice of Filing and attach the lower court summons as exhibits to the Notice as previously instructed by the Clerk's Office. Both of these documents will be disregarded. (JCH)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 **DISREGARD**NOTICE return on state court summons for Lannette Ngirablosch by Rita Lynette Meyers re #2 Answer to Complaint (Jacobs, Catherine) Modified on 8/20/2019 (JCH).
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 **DISREGARD**NOTICE return on state court summons for Enrilley Kiuluul by Rita Lynette Meyers re #3 State Court Record (Jacobs, Catherine) Modified on 8/20/2019 (JCH).
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 State Court Record by Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company Volumes 1 of 1 (Sterling, Timothy)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by USAA General Indemnity Company.(Sterling, Timothy)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by USAA General Indemnity Company from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Mississippi, case number 30CI1:19cv107DH. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 05384045877) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Circuit Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Notice, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyers v. Ngirablosch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrilley M. Kiuluul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Represented By: Timothy J. Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lannette T. Ngirablosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Lynette Meyers
Represented By: Catherine H. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?