Echoles v. Tsang
Plaintiff: Beverly Anita Echoles
Defendant: Brian Tsang
Case Number: 1:2019cv00433
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Brian Tsang answer due 10/10/2019. (King, Steve)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant shall have until 10/10/2019 to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on September 20, 2019 (King, Steve)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Brian Tsang (Baria, David)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Brian Tsang served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (JCH)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Brian Tsang. (JCH)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on August 9, 2019 (King, Steve)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Beverly Anita Echoles (wld)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Brian Tsang, filed by Beverly Anita Echoles. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Letter of Determination, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2019: #4 Notice of Assignment) (wld).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Echoles v. Tsang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Anita Echoles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Tsang
Represented By: David W. Baria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?