Elly v. American National Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Hope Elly
Defendant: Dillard's Inc. and American National Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00502
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer or Other Responsive Pleading. Defendant Dillard's Inc.'s deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 11/1/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 9/20/2019 (AG)
September 20, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 5 and # 6. Attorney is advised that the correct judge initials for this case are HSO-JCG, which should be used on all future filings. (JCH)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Dillard's Inc. (Adams, Joseph)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Lee Adams on behalf of Dillard's Inc. (Adams, Joseph)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hope Elly. Dillard's Inc. served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Barrett, Pshon)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hope Elly. American National Insurance Company served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Barrett, Pshon)
August 14, 2019 Remark: Original issued summonses mailed to attorney for service at address on summonses via regular us mail. (RLW)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to American National Insurance Company, Dillard's Inc. (RLW)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American National Insurance Company, Dillard's Inc. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-4059541), filed by Hope Elly (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elly v. American National Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillard's Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Lee Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Elly
Represented By: Pshon Barrett
Represented By: Bradley Davis McAdory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?