Ready v. Mississippi Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Rodney Ready
Defendant: Kimberly Echols, Falisha McClendon, Malika Rush, Jeremy St. Julian, Mississippi Department of Corrections and Lyndo Ramero
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv00526
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #10 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying #11 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying #11 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr., on 10/8/2019. (BR)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, MOTION to Reopen Case by Rodney Ready. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by Rodney Ready (Attachments: #1 Administrative Remedy Program Documents, #2 Envelope)(PKS)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 FINAL JUDGMENT: This civil action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 9/3/19 (PKS)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AS MALICIOUS: that pro se Plaintiff Rodney Ready's Complaint #1 is dismissed with prejudice as malicious pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (e)(2)(B)(i). Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 9/3/19 (PKS)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and *RESTRICTED* granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 9/3/19 (PKS)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2. Acknowledgement filed by Rodney Ready. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PKS)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Rodney Ready (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PKS)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: That on or before 9/18/19, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 8/19/19 (PKS)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 9/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 8/19/19 (PKS)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Rodney Ready (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kimberly Echols, Falisha McClendon, Mississippi Department of Corrections, Lyndo Ramero, Malika Rush, Jeremy St. Julian, filed by Rodney Ready. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Exhibit A - various documents, #3 Notice of Assignment)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ready v. Mississippi Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Falisha McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malika Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy St. Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyndo Ramero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Ready
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?