Patterson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Brittany Danielle Patterson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2019cv00532
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 Second MOTION for David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brittany Danielle Patterson (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Varnado, Mager)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion does not identify the cases in which movant presently appears in this state (See p. 5, section (H)). The motion is denied without prejudice to movant's right to refile the motion with the specified information. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on October 9, 2019 (KPM)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION for David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brittany Danielle Patterson (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Varnado, Mager)
September 25, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5. Incorrect document attached. Counsel should re-file with the correct document attached. Proposed orders should be emailed directly to chambers and not attached to any filings. Document #5 should be disregarded and will be terminated. (wld)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 (DISREGARD)First MOTION for David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4096509) by Brittany Danielle Patterson (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Varnado, Mager) Modified on 9/25/2019 (wld).
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (RLW)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on August 21, 2019. (MMc)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brittany Danielle Patterson (RLW)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Brittany Danielle Patterson (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Danielle Patterson
Represented By: Mager A. Varnado, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?