Gulf States Conference of Seventh-Day Adventists et al v. City of Gulfport, Mississippi
Plaintiff: Carlos Sebastian, Jace Addison and Gulf States Conference of Seventh-Day Adventists
Defendant: City of Gulfport, Mississippi
Case Number: 1:2019cv00541
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Proceedings or for Other Relief by City of Gulfport, Mississippi (Bruni - City Gov, Jeffrey)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for additional time to file responsive pleading. The City of Gulfport, Mississippi, has until 10/15/19 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 9/24/19 (HM)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint , Reserving Rule 12, FRCP, Objections, and All Defenses, Affirmative or Otherwise by City of Gulfport, Mississippi (Bruni - City Gov, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gulf States Conference of Seventh-Day Adventists. City of Gulfport, Mississippi served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Fairbank, Jonathan)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER withdrawing Text Only Order entered 9/3/2019 as it pertains to the denial of the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Todd R. McFarland. It is hereby ordered that plaintiffs' motion #3 is granted and Todd R. McFarland is admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of plaintiffs in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 9/5/2019 (AB)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER denying without prejudice #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Todd R. McFarland; granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Gordan Schultz. The Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice #3 of Todd R. McFarland is denied for failure to attach a certificate of good standing by the appropriate licensing authority according to L. U. R. Civ. 83.1(d)(4). That Andrew Gordan Schultz be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiffs in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 9/3/2019 (AB)
September 3, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 4. Attorney is advised that the correct judge initials for this case are HSO-JCG, which should be used on all future filings. (JCH)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Andrew Gordan Schultz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4078765) by Gulf States Conference of Seventh-Day Adventists (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing from the New Mexico Supreme Court)(Fairbank, Jonathan)
August 30, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 3. Attorney is advised that the Signed Application that is attached as exhibit 1 should have been the main document. A motion is not necessary, the application acts as a motion. Attorney is not required to re-file, but should follow this procedure in future filings. (JCH)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Todd R. McFarland to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4077221) by Gulf States Conference of Seventh-Day Adventists (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from the Maryland Court of Appeals)(Fairbank, Jonathan)
August 23, 2019 Issued Summons mailed to counsel to address listed on summons/docket. (JCH)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Gulfport, Mississippi. (JCH)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Gulfport, Mississippi (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0538-4070564), filed by Gulf States Conference of Seventh-Day Adventists, Carlos Sebastian, Jace Addison. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gulf States Conference of Seventh-Day Adventists et al v. City of Gulfport, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Sebastian
Represented By: Jonathan B. Fairbank
Represented By: Todd R. McFarland - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jace Addison
Represented By: Jonathan B. Fairbank
Represented By: Todd R. McFarland - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gulf States Conference of Seventh-Day Adventists
Represented By: Jonathan B. Fairbank
Represented By: Todd R. McFarland - PHV
Represented By: Andrew Gordon Schultz - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Gulfport, Mississippi
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Bruni - City Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?