Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Buoy's LLC et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Peermusic III Ltd, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Collition Music, Inc., The Bernard Edwards Company LLC, Fourteenth Hour Music Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc. and Springtime Music, Inc.
Defendant: Cody Waters, Buoy's LLC, Kevin McKay and Roger Caplinger
Case Number: 1:2019cv00547
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 18 Original ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, by Buoy's LLC, Roger Caplinger, Kevin McKay.(Pepper, Matthew)
October 21, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Rondor Music International, Inc., Collition Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Fourteenth Hour Music Inc., Springtime Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., The Bernard Edwards Company LLC, Peermusic III Ltd as to Roger Caplinger. (Smith, Leslie)
October 21, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rondor Music International, Inc., Collition Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Fourteenth Hour Music Inc., Springtime Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., The Bernard Edwards Company LLC, Peermusic III Ltd. Kevin McKay served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (Smith, Leslie)
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rondor Music International, Inc., Collition Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Fourteenth Hour Music Inc., Springtime Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., The Bernard Edwards Company LLC, Peermusic III Ltd. Buoy's LLC served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (Smith, Leslie)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 Summons on Amended Complaint Issued as to Buoy's LLC, Roger Caplinger, Kevin McKay. (wld)
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Bernard Edwards Company LLC (Smith, Leslie)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sony/ATV Songs LLC (Smith, Leslie)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Springtime Music, Inc. (Smith, Leslie)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rondor Music International, Inc. (Smith, Leslie)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Peermusic III Ltd (Smith, Leslie)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Collition Music, Inc. (Smith, Leslie)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fourteenth Hour Music Inc. (Smith, Leslie)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Smith, Leslie)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Buoy's LLC, Roger Caplinger, Kevin McKay, filed by Rondor Music International, Inc., Collition Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Fourteenth Hour Music Inc., Springtime Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., The Bernard Edwards Company LLC, Peermusic III Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule)(Smith, Leslie)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Broadcast Music, Inc., Collition Music, Inc., Fourteenth Hour Music Inc., Peermusic III Ltd, Rondor Music International, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Springtime Music, Inc., The Bernard Edwards Company LLC (Smith, Leslie)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MAILING OF "Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright" re #1 Complaint. (wld)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Buoy's LLC, Roger Caplinger, Kevin McKay, Cody Waters. (wld)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Buoy's LLC, Roger Caplinger, Kevin McKay, Cody Waters ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14643011627), filed by Rondor Music International, Inc., Collition Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Fourteenth Hour Music Inc., Springtime Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., The Bernard Edwards Company LLC, Peermusic III Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Buoy's LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Leslie W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peermusic III Ltd
Represented By: Leslie W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Leslie W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Collition Music, Inc.
Represented By: Leslie W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bernard Edwards Company LLC
Represented By: Leslie W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fourteenth Hour Music Inc.
Represented By: Leslie W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International, Inc.
Represented By: Leslie W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Springtime Music, Inc.
Represented By: Leslie W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buoy's LLC
Represented By: Matthew L. Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McKay
Represented By: Matthew L. Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Caplinger
Represented By: Matthew L. Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?