Noble v. IQ Data International, Inc./Rent Collect Global et al
Plaintiff: Courtney Noble
Defendant: Does 1-10 and IQ Data International, Inc./Rent Collect Global
Case Number: 1:2019cv00557
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 1/9/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. Plaintiff will place the telephone call to Judge Walker's chambers with all necessary counsel on the line. (SR)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement by Courtney Noble (Hussey, Curtis)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. IQ Data International, Inc./Rent Collect Global answer due 10/18/2019. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on October 4, 2019 (King, Steve)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by IQ Data International, Inc./Rent Collect Global (Biggers, Matthew)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Courtney Noble. IQ Data International, Inc./Rent Collect Global served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (Hussey, Curtis)
September 4, 2019 Remark: Original issued summons mailed to attorney to address on summons via regular us mail. (RLW)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to IQ Data International, Inc./Rent Collect Global. (RLW)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, with jury demand, against Does 1-10, IQ Data International, Inc./Rent Collect Global (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-4080209), filed by Courtney Noble (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noble v. IQ Data International, Inc./Rent Collect Global et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IQ Data International, Inc./Rent Collect Global
Represented By: Matthew T. Biggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Noble
Represented By: Curtis Ray Hussey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?