Holleman v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Plaintiff: Matthew Boyce Holleman
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Case Number: 1:2019cv00572
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #6: Pursuant to the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Section 2.C. and FED.R.Civ.P.11 an attorney's password issued by the court combined with the user's identification (login) serves as the attorney's signature for Rule 11 and other purposes. Attorneys should not permit other attorneys to use their login and password for any ECF filing. Document #6 will be disregarded and the attorney with the electronic signature on the document should re-file document. ***See Document #7 for correct entry*** (RLW)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Moss, Rajita)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 **ERROR**Disregard this entry. Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Moss, Rajita) Modified on 10/17/2019 (RLW).
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. (AB)
October 7, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4: Attorney is advised to list the defendant's name on all future filed pleadings as it was filed in the lawsuit. If the name is incorrect, attorney is advised to file a Motion to Correct Name. (RLW)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Service of PreDiscovery Disclosure by Matthew Boyce Holleman (Holleman, Tim)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Rajita Iyer Moss on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Moss, Rajita)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Bailey, Clifford (Ford))
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois from County Court of Harrison Co., MS, 1st Jud. Dist., case number D2401-19-1254, with jury demand in lower court. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-4086920) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Documents served on Safeco, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holleman v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Clifford (Ford) K. Bailey, III
Represented By: Rajita Iyer Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Boyce Holleman
Represented By: Tim C. Holleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?