Wood v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Susan A. Wood
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2019cv00670
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Susan A. Wood. Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/9/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. Service made upon: U S Attorney; U S Attorney General; Commissioner of SSA. (Merritt, Hannalore)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on October 1, 2019 (KPM)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security/Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (wld)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 05384100936), filed by Susan A. Wood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan A. Wood
Represented By: Hannalore Burns Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?