Elmore et al v. Kalin et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Anne Elmore and Billy Elmore
Defendant: Brian Morris, Tristan Armer and Martin Kalin
Case Number: 1:2019cv00679
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Docket Annotation as to Doc. #10. Incomplete linkage made. This memorandum should have also been linked to motion #7. All related filings to motions (using the "Responses and Replies" category, with the exception of "Response to Order") should be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has made the correction. (wld)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #9 Response in Opposition to #7 Motion filed by Tristan Armer, Martin Kalin, Brian Morris (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2- Elmore Depo, #3 Exhibit 3- Sale Contract, #4 Exhibit 4- Morris Kalin Loan Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5- Closing Statment, #6 Exhibit 6- Sheehan Depo, #7 Exhibit 7-Appraisal.)(Armer, Tristan) Modified on 10/28/2019 (wld).
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Tristan Armer, Martin Kalin, Brian Morris (Armer, Tristan)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 10/23/2019. (SR)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Billy Elmore, Elizabeth Anne Elmore (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint to Set Aside Foreclosure, #2 Exhibit B - Substituted Trustee's Deed, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Sale publication)(Bordis, Gaston)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) AND THE CLAIMS-SPLITTING BAR filed by Tristan Armer, Martin Kalin, Brian Morris (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint in Second Action, #2 Exhibit B- Amended Complaint in First Action)(Armer, Tristan)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) AND THE CLAIMS-SPLITTING BAR by Tristan Armer, Martin Kalin, Brian Morris (Armer, Tristan)
October 14, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Tristan Armer, Martin Kalin, Brian Morris (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Amended Complaint- Case 1, #2 Exhibit B- Complaint- Case 2)(Armer, Tristan)
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Tristan Armer, Martin Kalin, Brian Morris (Armer, Tristan)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 State Court Record by Defendants Tristan Armer, Martin Kalin, Brian Morris Volumes 1 of 1 (Armer, Tristan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tristan Armer, Martin Kalin, Brian Morris from Chancery Court of Jackson County, Mississippi, case number 2019-01524-MAM. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4104863) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Complaint to 1:18cv379HSO-JCG, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elmore et al v. Kalin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Morris
Represented By: Tristan Russell Armer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tristan Armer
Represented By: Tristan Russell Armer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Kalin
Represented By: Tristan Russell Armer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Anne Elmore
Represented By: Gaston C. Bordis, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Elmore
Represented By: Gaston C. Bordis, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?