McCullum v. Dorsey
Plaintiff: Cedric J. McCullum
Defendant: Monifa Dorsey
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv00699
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Change of Address as to Cecrick J. McCullum. Clerk updated city to Pascagoula, MS 39567 per Order #7. (wld)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO RE-MAIL: Clerk shall mail a copy of Orders [4,5] to plaintiff at 65 Bruce Evans Drive, Pascagoula, MS 39567. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 12/3/2019 (wld)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #5 Order Opsp8, #4 Order Opsp2. Mail sent to Cedric J. McCullum (wld)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER The plaintiff shall file within 30 days of the date of this order a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 11/21/2019 (wld)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 12/23/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 11/21/2019 (wld)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 Mail returned to sender containing NEF to document #1, #2 and Notice of Assignment sent to Cedric J. McCullum. (wld)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Cedric J. McCullum (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monifa Dorsey, filed by Cedric J. McCullum (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCullum v. Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric J. McCullum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monifa Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?