Gill v. Turner
Plaintiff: Gregory L. Gill
Defendant: Mississippi State Penitentiary and Marshall Turner
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv00716
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 *RESTRICTED* State Court Record - Habeas by Defendant Marshall Turner (Attachments: #1 State Court Record (SCR), Cause No. 2016-CP-01618, Vol. 1, #2 SCR, Cause No. 2016-CP-01618, Supp. Vol. 1, #3 SCR, Cause No. 2016-CP-01618, Supp. Vol. 2, #4 SCR, Cause No. 2016-CP-01618, Brief of Appelllant, #5 SCR, Cause No. 2016-CP-01618, Brief of Appellee, #6 SCR, Cause No. 2016-CP-01618, Case Folder)(Owens-State Gov, Jerrolyn) (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/9/2019) (RLW).
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2244(d) by Marshall Turner (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Plea Petition), #2 Exhibit B (Sentencing Order), #3 Exhibit C (Decision of Miss. Court of Appeals))(Owens-State Gov, Jerrolyn)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF Receipt of #5 Order by Jim Hood, Office of Attorney General. (PKS)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: that the Clerk replace Respondent Mississippi State Penitentiary with Marshall Turner, Superintendent and edit the short title to Gill v. Turner. Respondent Jim Hood file an answer within 20 days... see order. Clerk shall serve by certified mail, a copy of the Petition #1 , Order #3 , Response #4 and a copy of this order upon Jim Hood, Attorney General of the State of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 11/19/19 (PKS)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 Response to #3 ORDER filed by Gregory L. Gill (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PKS)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Ordered that the Petitioner shall file a written response on or before November 27, 2019, to name his custodian, as the proper Respondent in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 11/5/19. (JCH)
November 4, 2019 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 14643011831 (RLW)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: That on or before November 20, 2019, Petitioner shall complete and file the attached application or pay the $5.00 filing fee... see order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 10/21/19 (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs)(PKS)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Gregory L. Gill. (Attachments: #1 Petitioner's Brief of Arguments, #2 Envelope)(PKS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2019: #3 Notice of Assignment) (PKS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gill v. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory L. Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi State Penitentiary
Represented By: Jim Hood-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Turner
Represented By: Jerrolyn M. Owens-State Gov
Represented By: Jim Hood-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?