Strausbaugh v. New Orleans VA Hospital (SLVHCS) et al
Plaintiff: Steve Strausbaugh
Defendant: New Orleans VA Hospital (SLVHCS) and Fernando Rivera
Case Number: 1:2019cv00740
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 Second MOTION to Dismiss filed by New Orleans VA Hospital (SLVHCS) (Webb-Federal Gov, J.)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 Second MOTION to Dismiss by New Orleans VA Hospital (SLVHCS) (Webb-Federal Gov, J.)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion to stay disclosure requirements and discovery not related to immunity/jurisdictional issues raised in #4 motion to dismiss. Disclosure requirements and unrelated discovery are stayed pending ruling on the motion to dismiss, in accordance with Local Rule 16(b)(3)(B). NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on December 2, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO STAY DISCLOSURE REQUIREMENTS AND DISCOVERY NOT RELATED TO THE IMMUNITY AND JURISDICTIONAL ISSUES by New Orleans VA Hospital (SLVHCS), Fernando Rivera (Webb-Federal Gov, J.)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against New Orleans VA Hospital (SLVHCS), Fernando Rivera, filed by Steve Strausbaugh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-OPM Printout, #2 Exhibit 2-OPM Printout, #3 Exhibit 3-Proof of Residency, #4 Envelope)(wld)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Steve Strausbaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-OPM Printout, #2 Exhibit 2-OPM Printout, #3 Exhibit 3-OPM Proof of Residency, #4 Exhibit 4-Certified Mail Receipt of Service to U.S. Attorney General Washington DC, #5 Exhibit 5-Other Certified Mail Receipts for Service, #6 Envelope)(wld)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by New Orleans VA Hospital (SLVHCS), Fernando Rivera (Webb-Federal Gov, J.)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by New Orleans VA Hospital (SLVHCS), Fernando Rivera (Webb-Federal Gov, J.)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. New Orleans VA Hospital (SLVHCS) answer due 11/13/2019; Fernando Rivera answer due 11/13/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on October 29, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by New Orleans VA Hospital (SLVHCS), Fernando Rivera (Webb-Federal Gov, J.)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 State Court Record by Defendants New Orleans VA Hospital (SLVHCS), Fernando Rivera Volumes 1 (Webb-Federal Gov, J.)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by New Orleans VA Hospital (SLVHCS) from Circuit Court of Pearl River County, Mississippi, case number 55CI119cv121. If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Circuit Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strausbaugh v. New Orleans VA Hospital (SLVHCS) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Strausbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans VA Hospital (SLVHCS)
Represented By: J. Wesley Webb-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando Rivera
Represented By: J. Wesley Webb-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?