Kirkwood v. Herrinton et al
Plaintiff: Thurman Kirkwood
Defendant: Joe Herrinton, Ceasar and Pelicia Hall
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv00742
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Northern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00139. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 16, 2019 Case Transferred to District of Southern Mississippi. Case transferred via ECF. CASE CLOSED. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/16/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER transferring case to USDC, Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/16/19. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/16/2019.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #6 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/16/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Thurman Kirkwood. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (jla) Modified on 10/3/2019 (jwr). [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/16/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #5 Order Setting PSP Deadline and NOTICE OF INTENT to Continue Lawsuit (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/16/2019.]
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis without assessing payment of initial filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/1/19. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/16/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 10/18/2019.. Signed by Clerk on 9/18/19. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/16/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/16/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thurman Kirkwood. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/16/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #1 Complaint filed by Thurman Kirkwood. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/16/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement,, filed by Thurman Kirkwood. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirkwood v. Herrinton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thurman Kirkwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Herrinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ceasar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelicia Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?