ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. v. GAC North America - Shipping, GAC Shipping (USA), Inc. et al
Plaintiff: ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc.
Defendant: Offshore Heavy Transport, ASA and GAC North America - Shipping, GAC Shipping (USA), Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00902
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rachel Bland; granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David S. Bland; granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mallory G. Wynne. Rachel Bland, David S. Bland and Mallory G. Wynne are admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiff ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 12/9/2019 (AB)
December 9, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by David S. Bland $ 100, receipt number 34643057541 (MGB)
December 6, 2019 Remark: Original summonses for service were mailed to attorney at address on summonses via regular us mail. (RLW)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to GAC North America - Shipping, GAC Shipping (USA), Inc., Offshore Heavy Transport, ASA. (RLW)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Mallory G. Wynne to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4155131) by ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Letter of Good Standing)(Colon, Allison)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for David S. Bland to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Letter of Good Standing)(Colon, Allison)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Rachel Bland to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Letter of Good Standing)(Colon, Allison)
December 3, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Rachel Bland receipt number 0538-4153621 $ 100 (Colon, Allison)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GAC North America - Shipping, GAC Shipping (USA), Inc., Offshore Heavy Transport, ASA (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-4145150), filed by ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Word Order Nos. 1 and 2, #2 Exhibit B - Work Order No. 3, #3 Exhibit C - Work Order No. 4, #4 Exhibit D - 4/23/19 E-mail from Mike Pipkins, #5 Exhibit E - Invoices, #6 Exhibit F - Terms and Conditions, #7 Exhibit G - 11/6/19 Letter from Jeffrey Gehrmann to Adron Allen, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. v. GAC North America - Shipping, GAC Shipping (USA), Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Raquel Colon
Represented By: David S. Bland - PHV
Represented By: Mallory G. Wynne - PHV
Represented By: Rachel Bland- PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Offshore Heavy Transport, ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAC North America - Shipping, GAC Shipping (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?