Singing River Health System et al v. Grace et al
Plaintiff: Singing River Health System, Field Memorial Community Hospital, Tippah County Hospital, Jackson HMA, LLC, Natchez Hospital Company, LLC, Boa Vida Hospital of Aberdeen, MS, LLC, Magnolia Regional Health Center, Clarksdale HMA, LLC, Memorial Hospital at Gulfport, Wesley Health System, LLC, Biloxi HMA, LLC, Vicksburg Healthcare, LLC, River Oaks Hospital, LLC, ROH, LLC, North Sunflower Medical Center, Anderson Regional Health System, Delta Regional Medical Center, Brandon HMA, LLC, Madison HMA, LLC, Alliance Healthcare System and Progressive Medical Management of Bates Ville
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Specgx, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Henry Schein, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Allergan PLC, Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., CVS Indiana, LLC, Kroger Limited Partnership II, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Cardinal Health, Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Nathan C. Grace, Cephalon, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Walgreen Co., Inc., JM Smith Corporation, Jaclyn P. Gatling, H.D. Smith, LLC, Wal-Mart, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, The Kroger Co., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Leslie Roberson, Allergan USA, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. and Rite-Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00937
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Daniel Meyer on behalf of Jaclyn P. Gatling, Nathan C. Grace, Leslie Roberson (Meyer, Christopher)
January 6, 2020 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Anda, Inc. (Thomas, Stephen)
January 6, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Lee Thomas on behalf of Anda, Inc. (Thomas, Stephen)
January 6, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Simon T. Bailey on behalf of Anda, Inc. (Bailey, Simon)
January 6, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #28, #29, and #30: Advising attorney that in the future, the complete case number of 1:19cv937 LG-RHW should be included on all pleadings. (RLW)
January 3, 2020 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Thomas, Stephen)
January 3, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Lee Thomas on behalf of Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Thomas, Stephen)
January 3, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Simon T. Bailey on behalf of Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Bailey, Simon)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #24 Motion to Stay Proceedings. The Court has received notification that a Conditional Transfer Order has been filed by the U.S. Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. See MDL No. 2804, Docket No. 6566. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL FOLLOW. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 12/30/2019 (Guirola, Louis)
December 27, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 Emergency MOTION to Remand and For Expedited Briefing Schedule MOTION to Expedite filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc. (Louis, Thomas)
December 27, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 Emergency MOTION to Remand and For Expedited Briefing Schedule MOTION to Expedite filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc. (Louis, Thomas)
December 27, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 25. Proposed orders are not to be electronically filed as a separate pleading or as an attachment to a pleading, but instead are to be provided to chambers by e-mail (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec.5.B.). (JCH)
December 26, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order Granting Temporary Stay)(Louis, Thomas)
December 26, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order, Wells v. Purdue filed Oct. 4, 2019, #2 Exhibit B - Order, Hogg v. Purdue filed Sept. 4, 2019, #3 Exhibit C - Order, Angelina v. Allergan filed Dec. 4, 2019, #4 Exhibit D - Order, Williamson v. Purdue filed Oct. 29, 2019, #5 Exhibit E - Order, Duval v. Purdue filed July 26, 2019, #6 Exhibit F - Order, Ellis v. Walgreens filed July 24, 2019, #7 Exhibit G - Order, Walker v. OptumRx filed July 16, 2019, #8 Exhibit H - Order, Rockwall v. Purdue filed July 5, 2019, #9 Exhibit I - List of Pending Motions to Remand, #10 Exhibit J - Transfer Order No. 127, MDL 2804, #11 Exhibit K - Orders, Noble County filed Dec. 14, 2018 & Jan. 24, 2019, #12 Exhibit L - Order - Seminole v. Purdue filed Apr. 3, 2019, #13 Exhibit M - Order, Takoma v. Purdue filed Oct. 4, 2019)(Louis, Thomas)
December 23, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF FOURTH AMENDED BANKRUPTCY COURT ORDER EXTENDING INJUNCTION AGAINST CONTINUATION OF THESE PROCEEDINGS AS TO RELATED PARTIES TO DEBTOR PURDUE PHARMA L.P. AND AFFILIATED DEBTORS by Jaclyn P. Gatling, Nathan C. Grace, Leslie Roberson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Fourth Amended Preliminary Injunction Order)(Woods, Ricardo)
December 18, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Patrick Strubel on behalf of H.D. Smith, LLC (Strubel, J.)
December 17, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Dorissa S. Smith on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc. (Smith, Dorissa)
December 17, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cardinal Health, Inc. (McCraney, W.)
December 17, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Thomas McCraney, III on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (McCraney, W.)
December 17, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Leo J. Carmody, Jr on behalf of Walgreen Co., Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc. (Carmody, Leo)
December 17, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Mayo, J.)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, granting #4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Certain Defendants, granting #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on December 17, 2019 (King, Steve)
December 17, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Certain Defendants to respond to the Complaint by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Mayo, J.)
December 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Cal Mayo, Jr on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Mayo, J.)
December 16, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by H.D. Smith, LLC identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for H.D. Smith, LLC. (Strubel, J.)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 12/16/2019. (SR)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (Hunt, Courtney)
December 13, 2019 Docket Annotation as to Doc. #9. This document requests two motion reliefs. Each motion relief should be selected from the list of motion titles or each relief docketed separately. The same PDF document may be used for all motion filing entries. It is not necessary to refile as court staff has made the necessary correction by adding the relief to "expedite" Attorney is advised to follow this procedure in future filings. (wld)
December 13, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 Emergency MOTION to Remand and For Expedited Briefing Schedule filed by Alliance Healthcare System, Anderson Regional Health System, Biloxi HMA, LLC, Boa Vida Hospital of Aberdeen, MS, LLC, Brandon HMA, LLC, Clarksdale HMA, LLC, Delta Regional Medical Center, Field Memorial Community Hospital, Jackson HMA, LLC, Madison HMA, LLC, Magnolia Regional Health Center, Memorial Hospital at Gulfport, Natchez Hospital Company, LLC, North Sunflower Medical Center, Progressive Medical Management of Bates Ville, ROH, LLC, River Oaks Hospital, LLC, Singing River Health System, Tippah County Hospital, Vicksburg Healthcare, LLC, Wesley Health System, LLC (Barrett, John)
December 13, 2019 Filing 9 Emergency MOTION to Remand and For Expedited Briefing Schedule by Alliance Healthcare System, Anderson Regional Health System, Biloxi HMA, LLC, Boa Vida Hospital of Aberdeen, MS, LLC, Brandon HMA, LLC, Clarksdale HMA, LLC, Delta Regional Medical Center, Field Memorial Community Hospital, Jackson HMA, LLC, Madison HMA, LLC, Magnolia Regional Health Center, Memorial Hospital at Gulfport, Natchez Hospital Company, LLC, North Sunflower Medical Center, Progressive Medical Management of Bates Ville, ROH, LLC, River Oaks Hospital, LLC, Singing River Health System, Tippah County Hospital, Vicksburg Healthcare, LLC, Wesley Health System, LLC (Barrett, John). Added MOTION to Expedite on 12/13/2019 (wld).
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Cole, Edderek)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Edderek Linnel Cole on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Cole, Edderek)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Tardy, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Tardy, Thomas)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenna L. Mansfield, Jr on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc. (Mansfield, Kenna)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Certain Defendants by H.D. Smith, LLC (Hinshaw, Corey)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc. (Louis, Thomas)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 Letter sent to MDL Clerk with docket entries and complaint/notice of removal. (wld)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc. from Chancery Court of Jackson County, Mississippi, case number 30CH1:19cv01879-TLH. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4156844) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Part 1-Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-Part 2-Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Part 1-State Court Record, #4 Exhibit B-Part 2-State Court Record, #5 Exhibit B-Part 3-State Court Record, #6 Exhibit C-Part 1-Service on Walmart, Inc., #7 Exhibit C-Part 2-Service on Walmart, Inc., #8 Exhibit D-Part 1-Service on Walmart Stores East, LP, #9 Exhibit D-Part 2-Service on Walmart Stores East, LP, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singing River Health System et al v. Grace et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
Represented By: Leo J. Carmody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Courtney Choi Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Simon T. Bailey
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Simon T. Bailey
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana, LLC
Represented By: J. Cal Mayo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Thomas M. Louis
Represented By: Kenna L. Mansfield, Jr.
Represented By: Dorissa S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: W. Thomas McCraney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan C. Grace
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Simon T. Bailey
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Represented By: Simon T. Bailey
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co., Inc.
Represented By: Leo J. Carmody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JM Smith Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaclyn P. Gatling
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith, LLC
Represented By: Corey D. Hinshaw
Represented By: J. Patrick Strubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Louis
Represented By: Kenna L. Mansfield, Jr.
Represented By: Dorissa S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Edderek Linnel Cole
Represented By: Thomas W. Tardy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: J. Cal Mayo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: J. Cal Mayo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Roberson
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Represented By: Simon T. Bailey
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite-Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Singing River Health System
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Field Memorial Community Hospital
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tippah County Hospital
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson HMA, LLC
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natchez Hospital Company, LLC
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boa Vida Hospital of Aberdeen, MS, LLC
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magnolia Regional Health Center
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarksdale HMA, LLC
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Memorial Hospital at Gulfport
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Health System, LLC
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Biloxi HMA, LLC
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicksburg Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: River Oaks Hospital, LLC
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROH, LLC
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Sunflower Medical Center
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anderson Regional Health System
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta Regional Medical Center
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon HMA, LLC
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madison HMA, LLC
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alliance Healthcare System
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Medical Management of Bates Ville
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?