ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. v. M/V Ralph E. Bouchard et al
Plaintiff: ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc.
Defendant: Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc. and M/V Ralph E. Bouchard
Intervenor Plaintiff: Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00955
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF ARREST OF VESSEL AND NOTICE FOR CLAIMS by ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. (JCH)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Service by Publication. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 2/6/2020 (MG)
February 6, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #23. L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings by also including the exhibit letter on the exhibit. (wld)
February 5, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Service by Publication of Notice of Attachment/Arrest by ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Arrest of Vessel)(Wynne - PHV, Mallory)
February 3, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc.. Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc. served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020. (Wynne - PHV, Mallory)
January 29, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 21. Attorney is advised that the complete case number 1:19cv955 LG-RHW, should be used on all future filings. (JCH)
January 29, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Delcambre, Jr on behalf of Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC (Delcambre, Paul)
January 28, 2020 Filing 20 U.S. Marshal's Returns executed (JCH)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Consent Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on January 23, 2020 (King, Steve)
January 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Arrest of Vessel by ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. (Wynne - PHV, Mallory)
January 21, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 17. 1.) L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to type in the exhibit letter/number in the description box in future filings. 2.) All future filings should have the complete case number listed as 1:19cv955 LG-RHW. (JCH)
January 20, 2020 Filing 17 Consent MOTION to Intervene by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit Invoice, #3 Affidavit Form 28 Affidavit)(McDade, Matthew)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appoint Custodian. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 12/20/19 (JCH)
December 20, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Appoint Custodian filed by ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. (Wynne - PHV, Mallory)
December 19, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Custodian by ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Indemnif Agreement Substitue Custodian)(Wynne - PHV, Mallory)
December 19, 2019 Filing 13 Process of Attachment and Garnishment. (JCH)
December 19, 2019 Filing 12 Warrant for Arrest in Rem Issued as to M/V Ralph E. Bouchard. (JCH)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Affirm; granting #8 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 12/18/19. (JCH)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for the Issuance of the Process of Attachment and Garnishment. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 12/18/19. (JCH)
December 18, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 8 and # 9. Proposed orders are not to be electronically filed as a separate pleading or as an attachment to a pleading, but instead are to be provided to chambers by e-mail (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec.5.B.). Attorney is advised that any warrants or writs attached to these document will still need to be delivered to the Clerk's Office for issuance if the motions are granted. DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 9. Clerk's Office has removed the Ex Parte restriction on this document. If documents are filed Ex Parte it seals the entry and makes it unavailable for viewing on ECF. (JCH)
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Order Authorizing Issuance of Warrant of Attachment by ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order Directing Issuance of the Process, #2 Attachment Process of Attachment and Garnishment)(Colon, Allison) Modified to remove Ex Parte on 12/18/2019 (JCH).
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Affirm , MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order for Arrest, #2 Attachment Warrant for Arrest)(Colon, Allison)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1 Complaint,, by ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. (Colon, Allison)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on December 16, 2019 (King, Steve)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Rachel S. Bland to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4162424) by ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment R. Bland's Letter of Good Standing)(Colon, Allison)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Mallory G. Wynne to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4162419) by ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment M. Wynne's Letter of Good Standing)(Colon, Allison)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for David Bland to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4162407) by ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment David Bland's Letter of Good Standing)(Colon, Allison)
December 13, 2019 Issued summons mailed to attorney to address listed on summons/docket. (JCH)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc. (JCH)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc., M/V Ralph E. Bouchard (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0538-4161998), filed by ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - 8/29/19 Correspondence, #3 Exhibit B - 11/7/19 Email Ralph Bouchard, #4 Exhibit - 9/20/19 Purchase Order, #5 Exhibit D - 11/8/19 Invoice, #6 Exhibit E - 11/13/19 Correspondence, #7 Exhibit F - Signed Certified Return Receipt, #8 Exhibit G - 8/16/19 STEHMO rates, #9 Exhibit H - 12/11/19 STEHMO invoice)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc. v. M/V Ralph E. Bouchard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST Engineering Halter Marine & Offshore, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Raquel Colon
Represented By: David S. Bland - PHV
Represented By: Rachel Bland- PHV
Represented By: Mallory G. Wynne - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Ralph E. Bouchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC
Represented By: Paul J. Delcambre, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew W. McDade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?