Ferrara Land Management Mississippi, LLC v. Landmark American Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Ferrara Land Management Mississippi, LLC
Defendant: John and Jane Does A, B and C and Landmark American Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00956
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Reset Hearing: Due to a conflict with Plaintiff's counsel schedule, the Telephonic Case Management Conference is RESET for 4/1/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. Counsel will follow all other instructions given in the Rule 16(a) Initial Order #10 . (AB)
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. (AB)
February 3, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Landmark American Insurance Company.(Currie, Edward)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 2/3/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 1/7/2020 (AG)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ferrara Land Management Mississippi, LLC. Landmark American Insurance Company served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Van Cleave, Christopher)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Landmark American Insurance Company (Currie, Edward)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael T. Beckers; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brent P. Frederick; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Danielle N. Goren. Michael T. Beckers, Brent P. Frederick and Danielle N. Goren are admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiff Ferrara Land Management Mississippi, LLC in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 12/18/2019 (AB)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Danielle N. Goren to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4163448) by Ferrara Land Management Mississippi, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Van Cleave, Christopher)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Brent P. Frederick to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4163446) by Ferrara Land Management Mississippi, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Van Cleave, Christopher)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Michael T. Beckers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4163438) by Ferrara Land Management Mississippi, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Van Cleave, Christopher)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ferrara Land Management Mississippi, LLC (Van Cleave, Christopher)
December 13, 2019 Remark: Original issued summons mailed to attorney at address on summons for service via regular us mail. (RLW)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Landmark American Insurance Company. (RLW)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, with jury demand, against John and Jane Does A, B and C, Landmark American Insurance Company (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-4162774), filed by Ferrara Land Management Mississippi, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Incident Report, #3 Exhibit C - Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferrara Land Management Mississippi, LLC v. Landmark American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does A, B and C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark American Insurance Company
Represented By: Edward J. Currie, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferrara Land Management Mississippi, LLC
Represented By: Christopher C Van Cleave
Represented By: Danielle N. Goren - PHV
Represented By: Michael T. Beckers - PHV
Represented By: Brent P. Frederick - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?