Tucker v. Backbay Mission
Plaintiff: Reginald R. Tucker
Defendant: Backbay Mission
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv00977
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 Unsigned Letter from Reginald Tucker (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (wld)
February 14, 2020 Filing 9 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 Acknowledgement filed by Reginald R. Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Copy of NEF to document 8 and Copies of Unsigned document 6 and 7, #2 Envelope)(wld)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH ORDER #3 AND DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SIGN HIS LETTERS {6,7] Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 2/4/2020 (wld)
February 4, 2020 Filing 7 (Unsigned) Letter from Reginald Tucker re: medicine (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (wld)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 (Unsigned) Letter from Reginald Tucker re: medication. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (wld)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Reginald R. Tucker (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER The plaintiff shall file within 30 days of the date of this order a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 12/20/19. (JCH)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 1/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 12/20/19. (JCH)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Reginald R. Tucker (wld)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Backbay Mission, filed by Reginald R. Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Backbay Mission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald R. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Backbay Mission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?