Harrison County, Mississippi et al v. Mississippi River Commission et al
Plaintiff: Mississippi Hotel and Lodging Association, City of Biloxi, Mississippi, Mississippi Commercial Fisheries United, Inc., Hancock County, Mississippi, City of Waveland, Mississippi, City of D'Iberville, Mississippi, Harrison County, Mississippi, City of Pass Christian, Mississippi and City of Diamondhead, Mississippi
Defendant: U.S. Army Corps of Engineers and Mississippi River Commission
Case Number: 1:2019cv00986
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by W. F. Hornsby, III on behalf of City of D'Iberville, Mississippi (Hornsby, W.)
January 31, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #10 and #11: Advising attorney that the name of each plaintiff and/or defendant should be listed in all future filed pleadings as filed in the Complaint. (RLW)
January 30, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #10 MOTION to Expedite Pretrial / Case Management Conference filed by City of Biloxi, Mississippi, City of D'Iberville, Mississippi, City of Diamondhead, Mississippi, City of Pass Christian, Mississippi, City of Waveland, Mississippi, Hancock County, Mississippi, Harrison County, Mississippi, Mississippi Commercial Fisheries United, Inc., Mississippi Hotel and Lodging Association (Wiygul, Robert)
January 30, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Expedite Pretrial / Case Management Conference by City of Biloxi, Mississippi, City of D'Iberville, Mississippi, City of Diamondhead, Mississippi, City of Pass Christian, Mississippi, City of Waveland, Mississippi, Hancock County, Mississippi, Harrison County, Mississippi, Mississippi Commercial Fisheries United, Inc., Mississippi Hotel and Lodging Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of A.M. Gilich, Jr., Mayor of Biloxi, Mississippi, #2 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Pam Ulrich, #3 Exhibit 3 Declaration of Linda Hornsby, #4 Exhibit 4 Declaration of Ryan Bradley, #5 Exhibit 5 Mississippi DMR Fisheries Loss Report, #6 Exhibit 6 Declaration of Dr. Robert Criss, #7 Exhibit 7 Plaintiffs Request for Production of Documents, #8 Exhibit 8 Declaration of Karin Barbee)(Wiygul, Robert)
January 29, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mississippi River Commission, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, filed by Mississippi Hotel and Lodging Association, Hancock County, Mississippi, City of D'Iberville, Mississippi, City of Waveland, Mississippi, Harrison County, Mississippi, Mississippi Commercial Fisheries United, Inc., City of Biloxi, Mississippi.(Wiygul, Robert)
January 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by City of Biloxi, Mississippi, City of D'Iberville, Mississippi, City of Waveland, Mississippi, Hancock County, Mississippi, Harrison County, Mississippi, Mississippi Commercial Fisheries United, Inc., Mississippi Hotel and Lodging Association (Wiygul, Robert)
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mississippi Hotel and Lodging Association, Hancock County, Mississippi, City of D'Iberville, Mississippi, City of Waveland, Mississippi, Harrison County, Mississippi, Mississippi Commercial Fisheries United, Inc., City of Biloxi, Mississippi. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers served on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (Wiygul, Robert)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C. Abide on behalf of City of Biloxi, Mississippi (Abide, Peter)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mississippi Hotel and Lodging Association, Hancock County, Mississippi, City of D'Iberville, Mississippi, City of Waveland, Mississippi, Harrison County, Mississippi, Mississippi Commercial Fisheries United, Inc., City of Biloxi, Mississippi. Mississippi River Commission served on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (Wiygul, Robert)
December 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Tim C. Holleman on behalf of Harrison County, Mississippi (Holleman, Tim)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald H. Blessey on behalf of City of Biloxi, Mississippi (Blessey, Gerald)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mississippi River Commission, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers. (RLW)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mississippi River Commission, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 14643011944), filed by Mississippi Hotel and Lodging Association, Hancock County, Mississippi, City of D'Iberville, Mississippi, City of Waveland, Mississippi, Harrison County, Mississippi, Mississippi Commercial Fisheries United, Inc., City of Biloxi, Mississippi (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison County, Mississippi et al v. Mississippi River Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mississippi Hotel and Lodging Association
Represented By: Robert B. Wiygul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Biloxi, Mississippi
Represented By: Robert B. Wiygul
Represented By: Gerald H. Blessey
Represented By: Peter C. Abide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mississippi Commercial Fisheries United, Inc.
Represented By: Robert B. Wiygul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hancock County, Mississippi
Represented By: Robert B. Wiygul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Waveland, Mississippi
Represented By: Robert B. Wiygul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of D'Iberville, Mississippi
Represented By: Robert B. Wiygul
Represented By: W. F. Hornsby, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harrison County, Mississippi
Represented By: Robert B. Wiygul
Represented By: Tim C. Holleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Pass Christian, Mississippi
Represented By: Robert B. Wiygul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Diamondhead, Mississippi
Represented By: Robert B. Wiygul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi River Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?