White v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Edmond David White
Defendant: BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00079
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by BP Exploration & Production, Inc. and BP America Production Company, and by Edmond David White (Nicks, Shantrell)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion to Withdraw Certain Counsel of Record. Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine Pyune McEldowney, Don Keller Haycraft, Devin C. Reid, Scott C. Seiler, and Georgia Lee Lucier are terminated as counsel of record for Defendants. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 3/20/20 (HM)
March 18, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP Exploration & Production Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP Exploration & Production Inc.. (Tardy, Thomas)
March 18, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP America Production Company identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP America Production Company. (Tardy, Thomas)
March 18, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Certain Counsel of Record by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas)
March 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Smith Millette on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Millette, Clare)
March 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles (Chan) E. McLeod on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (McLeod, Charles (Chan))
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Edderek Linnel Cole on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Cole, Edderek)
March 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Tardy, III on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas)
March 5, 2020 Filing 8 Letter sent to Hodges, Lucier, McEldowney, Reid, Seiler, Nations, Fuller and Wiesedeppe on 3/5/2020, requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (wld)
March 2, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-13317. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case transferred to Southern District of Mississippi. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/28/2020.(pp)(NEF:HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/2/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc., Edmond David White. Regarding Venue (Reid, Devin) Modified text/filers on 2/27/2020 (cwa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/2/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/2/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS NO.1 AND AMENDED ORDER NO.2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/2/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/2/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7925214) filed by Edmond David White. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Edmond David White(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/2/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmond David White
Represented By: Albertus F. Wiesedeppe
Represented By: Gary L. Fuller
Represented By: Howard L. Nations - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Devin C. *Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Catherine Pyune *McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee *Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Scott C. *Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Clare Smith Millette
Represented By: Edderek Linnel Cole
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Thomas W. Tardy, III
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Charles (Chan) E. McLeod
Represented By: Devin C. Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc.
Represented By: Devin C. *Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Catherine Pyune *McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee *Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Scott C. *Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Clare Smith Millette
Represented By: Edderek Linnel Cole
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Thomas W. Tardy, III
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Charles (Chan) E. McLeod
Represented By: Devin C. Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?