O'Sullivan v. Wells Fargo Bank
Plaintiff: Bernardine Jenne O'Sullivan
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Case Number: 1:2020cv00081
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. (AB)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 State Court Record by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank (Manley, Reid)
March 10, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #2. Incorrect event code selected. Counsel should have used the event code "Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal") which can be found under "Other Answers". Counsel does not need to refile. (wld)
March 9, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank.(Manley, Reid)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank from Jackson County Chancery Court, case number 2019-2144 TH. (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0538-4221126) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Sullivan v. Wells Fargo Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernardine Jenne O'Sullivan
Represented By: Michael L. Fondren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: Reid S. Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?