Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC et al v. Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC
Plaintiff: Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, Scott Dowdy, At Risk Solutions, LLC and Kent Bordelon
Defendant: Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00155
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Taylor B McNeel
2 Judge: Robert P Myers
3 Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr: TELEPHONIC Status Conference held on 3/6/2023 with attorneys Nathan L. Schrantz, David L. Browne - PHV, Cynthia Marie Cimino - PHV, David Randall Wade and Robert Alan Byrd regarding compliance with settlement agreement. (SR)
March 2, 2023 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 3/6/2023 09:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. Plaintiff will place the telephone call to Judge Myers' chambers with all necessary counsel on the line. (SR)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 AGREED ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Ordered that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Taylor B. McNeel on 12/27/21. (JCH)
December 21, 2021 Filing 118 (DISREGARD)Consent MOTION for Judgment Based on ADR Settlement by At Risk Solutions, LLC, Kent Bordelon, Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, Scott Dowdy (Browne - PHV, David) Modified on 12/21/2021 (wld).
December 21, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #118. Incorrect document attached. Proposed orders are not to be electronically filed as a separate pleading or as an attachment to a pleading, but instead are to be provided to chambers by e-mail (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec.5.B.). Document #118 should be disregarded.(wld)
December 6, 2021 Filing 117 NOTICE of Change of Address by Cynthia Marie Cimino - PHV (Cimino - PHV, Cynthia)
November 22, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr: TELEPHONIC Status Conference held on 11/22/2021 with attorneys Nathan L. Schrantz, David L. Browne - PHV, Cynthia Marie Cimino - PHV and David Randall Wade regarding language contained in the settlement agreement. (SR)
October 25, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr: Settlement Conference held on 10/25/2021. The case settled at the conference. The terms of the settlement were placed on the record. The parties shall have 60 days to consummate the settlement. Absent the parties requesting additional time to effectuate settlement, the Court will enter a final judgment of dismissal with prejudice. APPEARANCES: Scott Dowdy (Owner - Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC); Kent Bordelon (Owner - At Risk Solutions, LLC); Nathan L. Schrantz, David L. Browne - PHV and Cynthia Marie Cimino - PHV (counsel for Plaintiffs); Scott M Favre (Defendant); Jeff Houston (Attorney), and David Randall Wade (counsel for Defendant). (SR)
September 15, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings: Telephone Conference held on 9/15/2021 to reschedule the settlement conference with attorneys Nathan L. Schrantz, David L. Browne - PHV and David Randall Wade. (SR)
September 15, 2021 Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference RESET DUE TO CONFLICT WITH COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT'S SCHEDULE for 10/25/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 683 (Gulfport) before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. Although the COVID-19 pandemic has disrupted the normal functioning of Court business, it is the Court's intention to conduct an in-person settlement conference. LOCAL COUNSEL, LEAD COUNSEL AND PARTIES WITH FULL SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY MUST BE PHYSICALLY PRESENT AT THE CONFERENCE (INCLUDING INSURANCE CARRIERS WHO HAVE AUTHORITY). FAILURE TO APPEAR MAY RESULT IN SANCTIONS. (SR)
August 19, 2021 Filing 116 ATTACHMENT re #112 Response in Opposition to #109 Motion,,,, by At Risk Solutions, LLC, Kent Bordelon, Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, Scott Dowdy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Farve Email to PRASA w Dowdy CV, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - SMFPA Spreadsheet of Project Payments Received, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 - PRASA Notice of Second Disbursement, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 - Signed as Member PA (FEMA) Cabo Rojo Contract, #5 Exhibit Ex 5 - Signed Hwys and Transportation as President, #6 Exhibit Ex 6 - Farve Soliciation Ltr w attachments, #7 Exhibit Ex 12 - SMFPA 632-651 Barcelonetta FEMA-GM contract, #8 Exhibit Ex 13 - SMFPA 675-691 Catano FEMA-GM contract, #9 Exhibit Ex 14 - PRASA 6-1 to 1-30-19 Dr. Perkins invoice 3-14-19)(Cimino - PHV, Cynthia) Modified on 8/19/2021 (wld).
August 17, 2021 Docket Annotation as to Doc. #115. Incomplete linkage made. This reply should have also been linked to motion #109. All related filings to motions (using the"Responses and Replies" category, with the exception of "Response to Order") should be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has made the correction. (wld)
August 16, 2021 Filing 115 REPLY to Response to #109 Motion re #113 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #112 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, for Summary Judgment #109 filed by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. L Dowdy's Email, #2 Exhibit Ex. M Written Report of Karl Bach, #3 Exhibit Ex. N CV of Karl Bach)(Wade, David) Modified on 8/17/2021 (wld).
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER denying #111 Motion to Restrict from Public. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on August 16, 2021 (King, Steve)
August 10, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #111. Proposed orders are not to be electronically filed as a separate pleading or as an attachment to a pleading, but instead are to be provided to chambers by e-mail (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec.5.B.). Also, Memoranda in support should be filed separately and shown as a related document to the motion (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec. 3.A.7). Counsel advised the clerk that the memorandum requirement was waived due to the nature of this motion. (wld).
August 9, 2021 Filing 113 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #109 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by At Risk Solutions, LLC, Kent Bordelon, Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, Scott Dowdy (Browne - PHV, David)
August 9, 2021 Filing 112 RESPONSE in Opposition re #109 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by At Risk Solutions, LLC, Kent Bordelon, Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, Scott Dowdy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 12/29/17 Email from SMFPA to PRASA, #2 Exhibit 2 - SMFPA's 6/1/21 spreadsheet of project invoices and payments, #3 Exhibit 3 - Disbursement statement between SMFPA and PRASA, #4 Exhibit 4 - SMFPA contract with Cabo Rojo, #5 Exhibit 5 - SMFPA contract with PR Hwy and Trasnport, #6 Exhibit 6 - SMFPA client solicitation letter to PR Convention Center Dist. Authority, #7 Exhibit 7 - Early drafts of the agreement, #8 Exhibit 8 - SMFPA's acknowledgement of receipt of Plaintiffs' invoices, #9 Exhibit 9 - Depo of Scott Niolet, #10 Exhibit 10 - Dowdy verified responses to interrotatories, #11 Exhibit 11 - Bordelon verified responses to interrogatories, #12 Exhibit 12 - SMFPA's FEMA/GM Agreement with Barceloneta, #13 Exhibit 13 - SMFPA's FEMA/GM Agreement with Catano, #14 Exhibit 14 - SMFPA's FEMA bill to PRASA with Dr. Perkins' time for July 2018)(Browne - PHV, David)
August 9, 2021 Filing 111 MOTION to RESTRICT from public Certain Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by At Risk Solutions, LLC, Kent Bordelon, Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, Scott Dowdy (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Cimino - PHV, Cynthia)
July 27, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #109. Counsel is reminded to include the exhibit letter or number in the description of each exhibit in future filings. Counsel does not need to refile. (wld)
July 26, 2021 Filing 110 MEMORANDUM in Support re #109 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
July 26, 2021 Filing 109 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs Complaint, #2 Exhibit Dowdy-Bordelon Proposal, #3 Exhibit Prior Proposals, #4 Exhibit Dow Invoice # SFPR-1005 with attachments, #5 Exhibit Dowdy Depo transcript, #6 Exhibit Favre Depo transcript, #7 Exhibit Dow Responses to Requests for Admissions, #8 Exhibit Plaintiffs demand letter, #9 Exhibit Defendants pre-suit dispute letter, #10 Exhibit Dow Invoice Summary, #11 Exhibit Bordelon Depo transcript)(Wade, David)
June 30, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #107. Counsel is advised to use the correct Judge's initials on future filings. 1:20cv155TBM-RPM. (wld)
June 30, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #108. Incorrect document attached. Counsel should refile with a Notice of Service of Disclosure attached or refile using the event code "Pre-Discovery Disclosure". Document #108 will be disregarded. (wld)
June 29, 2021 Filing 108 (DISREGARD)NOTICE of Service of First Supplemental Disclosure by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David) Modified on 6/30/2021 (wld).
June 29, 2021 Filing 107 Supplemental NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosure by At Risk Solutions, LLC, Kent Bordelon, Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, Scott Dowdy (Browne - PHV, David)
June 29, 2021 Filing 106 NOTICE of Service of First Supplemental Response to Interrogatories by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
June 29, 2021 Filing 105 NOTICE of Service of Second Set Request for Production by At Risk Solutions, LLC, Kent Bordelon, Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, Scott Dowdy (Cimino - PHV, Cynthia)
June 29, 2021 Filing 104 NOTICE of Service of Third Set Response to Request for Production by Scott Dowdy (Cimino - PHV, Cynthia)
June 29, 2021 Filing 103 NOTICE of Service of Third Set Response to Request for Production by Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC (Cimino - PHV, Cynthia)
June 29, 2021 Filing 102 NOTICE of Service of Third Set Response to Request for Production by Kent Bordelon (Cimino - PHV, Cynthia)
June 29, 2021 Filing 101 NOTICE of Service of Third Set Response to Request for Production by At Risk Solutions, LLC (Cimino - PHV, Cynthia)
June 29, 2021 Filing 100 NOTICE of Service of Third Set Response to Interrogatories by Scott Dowdy (Cimino - PHV, Cynthia)
June 29, 2021 Filing 99 NOTICE of Service of Third Set Response to Interrogatories by Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC (Cimino - PHV, Cynthia)
June 29, 2021 Filing 98 NOTICE of Service of Third Set Response to Interrogatories by Kent Bordelon (Cimino - PHV, Cynthia)
June 29, 2021 Filing 97 NOTICE of Service of Third Set Response to Interrogatories by At Risk Solutions, LLC (Cimino - PHV, Cynthia)
June 29, 2021 Filing 96 NOTICE of Service of Second Set Interrogatories by At Risk Solutions, LLC, Kent Bordelon, Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, Scott Dowdy (Cimino - PHV, Cynthia)
June 29, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 106. Attorney is advised that the correct judge initials for this case are TBM-RPM, which should be used on all future filings. (JCH)
June 25, 2021 Filing 95 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Scott Dowdy (JCH)
June 25, 2021 Filing 94 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC. (JCH)
June 19, 2021 Filing 93 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kent Bordelon by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
June 19, 2021 Filing 92 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Scott Dowdy by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
June 18, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #84. Incorrect event code selected. Counsel should have selected "Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories". Counsel does not need to refile. (wld)
June 17, 2021 Filing 91 NOTICE of Service of Second Set Response to Request for Production by Scott Dowdy (Cimino - PHV, Cynthia)
June 17, 2021 Filing 90 NOTICE of Service of Second Set Response to Interrogatories by Scott Dowdy (Cimino - PHV, Cynthia)
June 17, 2021 Filing 89 NOTICE of Service of Second Set Response to Request for Production by Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC (Cimino - PHV, Cynthia)
June 17, 2021 Filing 88 NOTICE of Service of Second Set Response to Interrogatories by Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC (Cimino - PHV, Cynthia)
June 17, 2021 Filing 87 NOTICE of Service of Second Set Response to Request for Production by Kent Bordelon (Cimino - PHV, Cynthia)
June 17, 2021 Filing 86 NOTICE of Service of Second Set Response to Interrogatories by Kent Bordelon (Cimino - PHV, Cynthia)
June 17, 2021 Filing 85 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by At Risk Solutions, LLC (Cimino - PHV, Cynthia)
June 17, 2021 Filing 84 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Second Set of Interrogatories by At Risk Solutions, LLC (Cimino - PHV, Cynthia)
June 15, 2021 NOTICE of Calendar Setting: Reminder of the settlement conference previously set for 9/21/2021 01:30 PM in Courtroom 683 (Gulfport) before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. Counsel are instructed to submit to Judge Myers, seven (7) days prior to the conference, a memorandum (3-page maximum in PDF format) setting forth a brief explanation of the case, and a candid appraisal of their respective positions, including possible settlement figures. This document is NOT to be exchanged and will be viewed only by the Court. The settlement memoranda should be sent to Judge Myers via e-mail (myers_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov). Although the COVID-19 pandemic has disrupted the normal functioning of Court business, it is the Court's intention to conduct an in-person settlement conference. LOCAL COUNSEL, LEAD COUNSEL AND PARTIES WITH FULL SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY MUST BE PHYSICALLY PRESENT AT THE CONFERENCE (INCLUDING INSURANCE CARRIERS WHO HAVE AUTHORITY). FAILURE TO APPEAR MAY RESULT IN SANCTIONS. (SR)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #83 Unopposed Motion to Relax Local Rule 83.1 requirement that local counsel attend all depositions. The motion is granted for any depositions conducted on or before the discovery deadline of 6/29/2021. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on June 11, 2021 (King, Steve)
June 8, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #81. Attorney is advised to type in the deponent's name when docketing a notice of deposition in future filings. (wld)
June 7, 2021 Filing 83 Unopposed MOTION Relax Local Rule 83.1 requirement that local counsel attend all depositions by At Risk Solutions, LLC, Kent Bordelon, Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, Scott Dowdy (Browne - PHV, David)
June 7, 2021 Filing 82 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Scott Farve by At Risk Solutions, LLC, Kent Bordelon, Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, Scott Dowdy (Cimino - PHV, Cynthia)
June 7, 2021 Filing 81 NOTICE to Take Deposition by At Risk Solutions, LLC, Kent Bordelon, Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, Scott Dowdy (Cimino - PHV, Cynthia)
June 7, 2021 Filing 80 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Scott Niolet by At Risk Solutions, LLC, Kent Bordelon, Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, Scott Dowdy (Cimino - PHV, Cynthia)
June 7, 2021 Filing 79 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sarah Lebeau by At Risk Solutions, LLC, Kent Bordelon, Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, Scott Dowdy (Cimino - PHV, Cynthia)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying without prejudice Defendant's #50 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Taylor B. McNeel on 5/28/2021. (MS)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on May 28, 2021 (Attachment: #1 Acknowledgement and Agreement to Be Bound)(King, Steve)
May 28, 2021 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Taylor B. McNeel: Motion Hearing held by video conference on 5/28/2021 on #50 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - Lack of Standing - filed by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC. The Court heard argument on the Motion and, for reasons as stated on the record, the Motion was denied without prejudice. A separate Order will be entered. Defendant's unopposed ore tenus motion to extend the dispositive motion deadline was granted. A text only Order will be entered. APPEARANCES: N. Schrantz, D. Browne, C. Cimino for Plaintiff; D. Wade for Defendant; Court Reporter Teri Norton, Telephone Number: 228-563-1780. (KB)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting Defendant's ore tenus motion to extend dispositive motion deadline. Defendant's unopposed motion made in 5/28/2021 Motion Hearing is granted, and the dispositive motion deadline is extended for two (2) weeks. Dispositive motion deadline is 7/26/2021. Signed by District Judge Taylor B. McNeel on 5/28/2021. (KB)
May 28, 2021 RESET DEADLINE: Motions due by 7/26/2021. (KB)
May 27, 2021 Filing 76 NOTICE of Service of KENT BORDELON Request for Production by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
May 27, 2021 Filing 75 NOTICE of Service of KENT BORDELON Interrogatories by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
May 27, 2021 Filing 74 NOTICE of Service of AT RISK SOLUTIONS, LLC Request for Production by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
May 27, 2021 Filing 73 NOTICE of Service of AT RISK SOLUTIONS, LLC Interrogatories by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
May 27, 2021 Filing 72 NOTICE of Service of SCOTT DOWDY Request for Production by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
May 27, 2021 Filing 71 NOTICE of Service of SCOTT DOWDY Interrogatories by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
May 27, 2021 Filing 70 NOTICE of Service of DOW DISASTER RESTORATION, LLC Request for Production by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
May 27, 2021 Filing 69 NOTICE of Service of DOW DISASTER RESTORATION, LLC Interrogatories by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
May 26, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing on #50 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - Lack of Standing. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2021 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Taylor B. McNeel by VIDEO CONFERENCE. Video connection information has been emailed to counsel of record. (KB)
May 21, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 5/21/2021 with attorneys David L. Browne - PHV, Cynthia Marie Cimino - PHV and David Randall Wade. Defendant will produce documents on an ongoing basis to be completed no later than June 1, 2021. Parties will submit a proposed agreed protective order for the Court's consideration by close of business Monday, May 24, 2021. (SR)
May 18, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Discovery Conference set for 5/21/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. Plaintiff will place the telephone call to Judge Myers' chambers with all necessary counsel on the line. (SR)
May 11, 2021 Filing 68 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
May 11, 2021 Filing 67 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
May 11, 2021 Filing 66 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
May 11, 2021 Filing 65 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
May 11, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
May 11, 2021 Filing 63 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
May 11, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
May 11, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
May 11, 2021 SET HEARING as to #50 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - Lack of Standing. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 706 (Gulfport) before District Judge Taylor B. McNeel. (KB)
April 19, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE of Service of Designation of Experts by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
March 18, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiffs' Designation of Experts by At Risk Solutions, LLC, Kent Bordelon, Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, Scott Dowdy (Browne - PHV, David)
March 16, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #58. Counsel is reminded to include the exhibit letter or number in the description of each exhibit in future filings. Clerk has made the correction. (wld)
March 15, 2021 Filing 58 REPLY to Response to Motion re #51 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #50 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction -Lack of Standing, #57 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #56 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: pre-suit Attorney Browne demand letter, #2 Exhibit 2: pre-suit debtor dispute letter)(Wade, David) Modified on 3/16/2021 (wld).
March 8, 2021 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #50 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction -Lack of Standing filed by At Risk Solutions, LLC, Kent Bordelon, Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, Scott Dowdy (Browne - PHV, David)
March 8, 2021 Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition re #50 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction -Lack of Standing filed by At Risk Solutions, LLC, Kent Bordelon, Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, Scott Dowdy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Def's Answer to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Def's Responses to INTs, #3 Exhibit 3 - the Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Dow's Responses to RFAs, #5 Exhibit 5 - Dowdy's Responses to RFAs, #6 Exhibit 6 - Bordelon's Responses to RFAs, #7 Exhibit 7 - At Risk's Responses to RFAs, #8 Exhibit 8 - Pls' pre-suit demand, #9 Exhibit 9 - Def's response to Pls' pre-suit demand, #10 Exhibit 10- Payment records)(Browne - PHV, David)
February 22, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC (Browne - PHV, David)
February 22, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Scott Dowdy (Browne - PHV, David)
February 22, 2021 Filing 53 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Kent Bordelon (Browne - PHV, David)
February 22, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by At Risk Solutions, LLC (Browne - PHV, David)
February 21, 2021 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM in Support re #50 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction -Lack of Standing filed by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
February 21, 2021 Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction -Lack of Standing by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX 1- Complaint with attachments, #2 Exhibit EX 2 - Dow Responses to INTs, #3 Exhibit EX 3- Dowdy Responses to INTs, #4 Exhibit EX 4- Bordelon Responses to INTs, #5 Exhibit EX 5- At Risk Resp to INTs)(Wade, David)
January 26, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC (Browne - PHV, David)
January 26, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by Scott Dowdy (Browne - PHV, David)
January 26, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by Kent Bordelon (Browne - PHV, David)
January 26, 2021 Filing 46 NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by At Risk Solutions, LLC (Browne - PHV, David)
January 26, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Admissions by Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC (Browne - PHV, David)
January 26, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Admissions by Scott Dowdy (Browne - PHV, David)
January 26, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Admissions by Kent Bordelon (Browne - PHV, David)
January 26, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Admissions by At Risk Solutions, LLC (Browne - PHV, David)
January 7, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr: Telephone Conference held on 1/7/2021 with attorneys Nathan L. Schrantz, David L. Browne - PHV, Cynthia Marie Cimino - PHV and David Randall Wade regarding the reassignment of District Judge Taylor B. McNeel to the matter and entering an amended case management order. The status of the case was discussed and the current case management deadlines will remain in effect with Judge McNeel as the district judge. Text Only Order to follow. (SR)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 12/15-16/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 706 (Gulfport) before District Judge Taylor B. McNeel. Jury Trial set during a four-week term of Court beginning on 1/4/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 706 (Gulfport) before District Judge Taylor B. McNeel. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/15/2021. ADR Report due by 12/8/2021. EDT: 5-10 days. All other case management deadlines remain unchanged. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 1/7/2021 (SR)
December 21, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 1/7/2021 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. to enter an amended case management order to conform to Judge McNeel's trial calendar. Plaintiff will place the telephone call to Judge Myers' chambers with all necessary counsel on the line. (SR)
December 20, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Service of Defendants First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff, Scott Dowdy Request for Production by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
December 20, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Service of Defendants First Set of Requests for Admissions to Plaintiff, Scott Dowdy Request for Admissions by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
December 20, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Service of Defendants First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff, Scott Dowdy Interrogatories by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
December 20, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Service of Defendants First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff, Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC Request for Production by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
December 20, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Service of Defendants First Set of Requests for Admissions to Plaintiff, Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC Request for Admissions by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
December 20, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Service of Defendants First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff, Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC Interrogatories by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
December 20, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Service of Defendants First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff, Kent Bordelon Request for Production by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
December 20, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Service of Defendants First Set of Requests for Admissions to Plaintiff, Kent Bordelon Request for Admissions by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
December 20, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Service of Defendants First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff, Kent Bordelon Interrogatories by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
December 20, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Service of Defendants First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff, At Risk Solutions, LLC Request for Production by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
December 20, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Service of Defendants First Set of Requests for Admissions to Plaintiff, At Risk Solutions, LLC Request for Admissions by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
December 20, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Service of Defendants First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff, At Risk Solutions, LLC Interrogatories by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Taylor B. McNeel for all further proceedings. District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 12/18/2020 (PKS)
December 18, 2020 Attorneys are advised to include the case number and new judge assignment of 1:20cv155TBM-RPM on future filed pleadings. (PKS)
December 14, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures Disclosure by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
December 14, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
December 14, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiffs' Rule 26 Disclosure by At Risk Solutions, LLC, Kent Bordelon, Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, Scott Dowdy (Cimino - PHV, Cynthia)
December 14, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #25. Counsel should use the correct Magistrate Judge's initials on future filings. 1:20cv155LG-RPM. (wld)
December 11, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Disclosure due by 12/21/2020. Jury Trial set during a four-week term of Court beginning on 1/4/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 606 (Gulfport) before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 12/15-16/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 606 (Gulfport) before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Discovery due by 6/29/2021. Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 1/22/2021. Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 1/22/2021. Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 3/18/2021. Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 4/20/2021. Motions due by 7/12/2021. Settlement Conference set for 9/21/2021 01:30 PM in Chambers 672 (Gulfport) before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. ADR Report due by 12/8/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/15/2021. EDT: 5-10 days. Parties do not consent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 11/23/2020 (SR)
November 23, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 11/23/2020 with attorneys Nathan L. Schrantz, David L. Browne - PHV, Cynthia Marie Cimino - PHV and David Randall Wade. (SR)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #12 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The parties have advised that there are no objections to the Court finding this Motion as moot. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 11/16/2020 (cf)
November 13, 2020 Reset Hearings: Telephonic Case Management Conference RESET DUE TO A CHANGE IN THE COURT'S SCHEDULE for 11/23/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. Counsel will follow the instructions given in the Initial Rule 16(a) Order. (SR)
November 2, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Request for Production by At Risk Solutions, LLC, Kent Bordelon, Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, Scott Dowdy (Browne - PHV, David)
November 2, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Interrogatories by At Risk Solutions, LLC, Kent Bordelon, Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, Scott Dowdy (Browne - PHV, David)
October 22, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #19 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC.(Browne - PHV, David)
October 20, 2020 Filing 20 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/23/2020 01:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. (SR)
October 5, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #19. Counsel should use the correct Magistrate Judge's initials on future filings. 1:20cv155LG-RPM. (wld)
October 5, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #19. Clerk has deleted At Risk Solutions, LLC, Scott Dowdy and Kent Bordelon as counter defendants on the docket. Counsel inadvertently selected them when filing the counterclaim. (wld)
October 2, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC.(Wade, David) Modified on 10/5/2020 (wld).
September 19, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, At Risk Solutions, LLC, Kent Bordelon, Scott Dowdy. Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (Browne - PHV, David)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER taking under advisement #12 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Granting an Additional Thirty Days to Effect Service of Process Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 09/01/2020 (Guirola, Louis)
August 26, 2020 Docket Annotation as to Doc. #16. Incomplete linkage made. This reply should have also been linked to motion #12. All related filings to motions (using the"Responses and Replies" category, with the exception of "Response to Order") should be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has made the correction. (wld)
August 25, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #12 Motion re #15 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit written limited authority, #2 Exhibit declaration of Sarah Lebeau)(Wade, David) Modified on 8/26/2020 (wld).
August 18, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by At Risk Solutions, LLC, Kent Bordelon, Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, Scott Dowdy (Browne - PHV, David)
August 18, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by At Risk Solutions, LLC, Kent Bordelon, Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, Scott Dowdy (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex 1 - Affidavit of Process Server, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Pls' counsel ltr to Def's counsel, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 - Def's counsel ltr to Pls' counsel)(Browne - PHV, David)
August 5, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
August 5, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Proof of Service with attachments, #2 Exhibit 2: Declaration of Cindy L. Favre)(Wade, David) Modified on 8/5/2020 (wld).
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David Randall Wade on behalf of Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Wade, David)
August 5, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #11, 12 and 13. Counsel is reminded to use the newly assigned Magistrate Judge's initials on future filings. 1:20cv155LG-RPM. This case was reassigned to Magistrate Judge Myers on 8/3/2020. (wld)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker no longer assigned to case Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 8/3/2020 (wld)
August 3, 2020 All parties should use the newly assigned Magistrate Judge's initials on future filings. (wld)
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, At Risk Solutions, LLC, Kent Bordelon, Scott Dowdy. (Attachments: #1 SMFPA,LLC grant of general agency to Scott M. Favre)(Browne - PHV, David) Modified on 7/23/2020 (wld).
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, At Risk Solutions, LLC, Kent Bordelon, Scott Dowdy. Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC served on 7/15/2020, answer due 8/5/2020. (Browne - PHV, David)
July 22, 2020 Docket Annotation as to Doc. #8. A return on summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Attorney is directed to refile. (wld)
June 24, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Cynthia Cimino receipt number 0538-4305650 $ 100 (Schrantz, Nathan)
June 24, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for David L Browne receipt number 0538-4305639 $ 100 (Schrantz, Nathan)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on June 23, 2020 (King, Steve)
June 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Cynthia Cimino to Appear Pro Hac Vice by At Risk Solutions, LLC, Kent Bordelon, Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, Scott Dowdy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Schrantz, Nathan)
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for David L. Browne to Appear Pro Hac Vice by At Risk Solutions, LLC, Kent Bordelon, Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, Scott Dowdy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Schrantz, Nathan)
June 15, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to document #3 & #4. These documents should not be filed "Ex Parte". Counsel should refile using the motion relief "Appear Pro Hac Vice". Document #3 and #4 will be terminated and should be disregarded. (wld)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC. (RLW)
April 30, 2020 Remark: Original Summons for service mailed to attorney to address on summons via regular us mail. (RLW)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-4263368), filed by Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC, At Risk Solutions, LLC, Kent Bordelon, Scott Dowdy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Demand Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC et al v. Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dow Disaster Restoration, LLC
Represented By: Nathan L. Schrantz
Represented By: David L. Browne - PHV
Represented By: Cynthia Marie Cimino - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Dowdy
Represented By: Nathan L. Schrantz
Represented By: David L. Browne - PHV
Represented By: Cynthia Marie Cimino - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: At Risk Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Nathan L. Schrantz
Represented By: David L. Browne - PHV
Represented By: Cynthia Marie Cimino - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Bordelon
Represented By: Nathan L. Schrantz
Represented By: David L. Browne - PHV
Represented By: Cynthia Marie Cimino - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott M. Favre Public Adjuster, LLC
Represented By: David Randall Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?