Eubanks v. Harrison County Jail et al
Plaintiff: David Eubanks
Defendant: Harrison County Jail and Vital Core Health Providers
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2020cv00178
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE MORE INFORMATION: On or before July 15, 2020, plaintiff must file a written response to the items specifically listed in the order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 6/15/2020 (PKS)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 6/15/2020 (PKS)
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from David Eubanks regarding mail opened at the jail and requesting acknowledgment that motion to proceed in forma pauperis was filed. Clerk has mailed Notice of Electronic Filing of Motion to plaintiff at the address listed on the docket. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (PKS)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2. Acknowledgement filed by David Eubanks. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PKS)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 6/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 5/29/20. (JCH)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by David Eubanks (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PKS)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Harrison County Jail, Vital Core Health Providers filed by David Eubanks. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(PKS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eubanks v. Harrison County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vital Core Health Providers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?