Motts v. George Co. Regional Jail et al
Plaintiff: Charles Edward Motts
Defendant: Bobby Fairley and George Co. Regional Jail
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2020cv00186
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Bobby Fairley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Petition to Plead Guilty), #2 Exhibit B (Order to RID), #3 Exhibit C (Final Sentencing), #4 Exhibit D (Transcript of Revocation), #5 Exhibit E (Order of Revocation of Probation), #6 Exhibit F (Affidavit and ARP forms), #7 Exhibit G (Pro Se Motion to Clarify Sentence), #8 Exhibit H (Order of George County Circuit Court denying Motion to Clarify Sentence))(Owens-State Gov, Jerrolyn)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles Edward Motts: Central MS Correctional Facility, C-Building D Zone Bed 80, P.O. Box 88550, Pearl, MS 39288-8550 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #5 Acknowledgment of Service. Mail sent to Charles Edward Motts. (RLW)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Bobby Fairley served on 6/29/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (RLW)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk is directed to receive and file the Petition without prepayment of fees or costs. George County Regional Jail is removed as a Respondent. Respondent Warden Bobby Fairley, through Lynn Fitch, shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this cause within 20 days of the service upon Lynn Fitch of a copy of this Order. Clerk shall serve, by certified mail, a copy of #1 Petition along with a copy of this Order upon Lynn Fitch. Clerk shall serve a copy of this Order upon Petitioner by mailing same to his last known address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 6/25/20. (RLW)
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles Edward Motts (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER The plaintiff shall file within 30 days of the date of this order a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 6/4/20. (RLW)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Charles Edward Motts (Attachments: #1 Final Sentencing Probation and Order of Revocation of Probation, #2 Envelope, #3 Notice of Assignment) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Motts v. George Co. Regional Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Fairley
Represented By: Lynn Fitch-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Co. Regional Jail
Represented By: Lynn Fitch-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Edward Motts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?