XL Specialty Insurance Company et al v. Z Marine LLC et al
Plaintiff: XL Catlin, Deer Dynasty Ranch LLC, XL Specialty Insurance Company and Scott W. Gurney
Defendant: Sierra International LLC, Seastar Solutions, Sierra International, Inc., Marine Acquisition Corp., Z Marine LLC, Med Art Marine and Domestic Group AB
Case Number: 1:2020cv00213
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
2 Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #14. Counsel should use the correct Magistrate Judge's initials on future filings. 1:20cv213LG-RPM. (wld)
August 20, 2020 Filing 14 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Marine Acquisition Corp., Seastar Solutions, Sierra International LLC, Sierra International, Inc..(Kennedy, Jon)
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles B. Wynn, Jr on behalf of Med Art Marine (Wynn, Charles)
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Med Art Marine.(Thompson, Robert)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Response due August 24, 2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 08/05/2020. (smb)
August 5, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Med Art Marine answer due 8/24/2020. (wld)
August 5, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5,6,7,8,9,10 and 11. A return on summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Attorney is directed to refile. (wld)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by XL Catlin, Scott W. Gurney, XL Specialty Insurance Company, Deer Dynasty Ranch LLC. Seastar Solutions served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. (Spann, Catherine)
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by XL Catlin, Scott W. Gurney, XL Specialty Insurance Company, Deer Dynasty Ranch LLC. Sierra International LLC served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. (Spann, Catherine)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by XL Catlin, Scott W. Gurney, XL Specialty Insurance Company, Deer Dynasty Ranch LLC. Sierra International, Inc. served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. (Spann, Catherine)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by XL Catlin, Scott W. Gurney, XL Specialty Insurance Company, Deer Dynasty Ranch LLC. Marine Acquisition Corp. served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. (Spann, Catherine)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by XL Catlin, Scott W. Gurney, XL Specialty Insurance Company, Deer Dynasty Ranch LLC. Domestic Group AB served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. (Spann, Catherine)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by XL Catlin, Scott W. Gurney, XL Specialty Insurance Company, Deer Dynasty Ranch LLC. Z Marine LLC served on 7/15/2020, answer due 8/5/2020. (Spann, Catherine)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by XL Catlin, Scott W. Gurney, XL Specialty Insurance Company, Deer Dynasty Ranch LLC. Med Art Marine served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Spann, Catherine)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Med Art Marine (Thompson, Robert)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 8/3/20 (PKS)
August 3, 2020 Parties should include the newly assigned Magistrate Judge's initials RPM on future filings. (PKS)
June 29, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Domestic Group AB, Marine Acquisition Corp., Med Art Marine, Seastar Solutions, Sierra International LLC, Sierra International, Inc., Z Marine LLC. (JCH)
June 29, 2020 Issued summons mailed to attorney to address listed on docket/summons. (JCH)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Domestic Group AB, Marine Acquisition Corp., Med Art Marine, Seastar Solutions, Sierra International LLC, Sierra International, Inc., Z Marine LLC (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0538-4308406), filed by XL Catlin, Scott W. Gurney, XL Specialty Insurance Company, Deer Dynasty Ranch LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: XL Specialty Insurance Company et al v. Z Marine LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XL Catlin
Represented By: Catherine S. Spann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deer Dynasty Ranch LLC
Represented By: Catherine S. Spann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XL Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Catherine S. Spann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott W. Gurney
Represented By: Catherine S. Spann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra International LLC
Represented By: Jon Stephen Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seastar Solutions
Represented By: Jon Stephen Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra International, Inc.
Represented By: Jon Stephen Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marine Acquisition Corp.
Represented By: Jon Stephen Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z Marine LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Med Art Marine
Represented By: Charles B. Wynn, Jr.
Represented By: Robert P. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domestic Group AB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?