Peterson v. Pearl River County, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Wallace Dwayne Peterson, Jr.
Defendant: Pearl River County, Mississippi, David Allison and John and Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2020cv00216
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher E. Smith on behalf of Wallace Dwayne Peterson, Jr (Smith, Christopher)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. (AB)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by David Allison, Pearl River County, Mississippi.(Allen, William)
July 1, 2020 Remark: Original issued summonses for service and return emailed to attorney. (RLW)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to David Allison, Pearl River County, Mississippi. (RLW)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, with jury demand, against David Allison, John and Jane Does 1-10, Pearl River County, Mississippi (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-4311113), filed by Wallace Dwayne Peterson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Pearl River County, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wallace Dwayne Peterson, Jr.
Represented By: G. Morgan Holder
Represented By: Christopher E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearl River County, Mississippi
Represented By: William Robert Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Allison
Represented By: William Robert Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?