Ferguson v. Errington et al
Plaintiff: James Ferguson
Defendant: Joe Errington and South Mississippi Correctional Institution
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2020cv00266
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
2 Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Recusal. Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 9/28/20. (RLW)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #4 Order Opsp2. Acknowledgement filed by James Ferguson (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by James Ferguson (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Recusal by James Ferguson (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #4 Order Opsp2, #5 Order Opsp8. Mail sent to James Ferguson. (RLW)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Ordered that the Clerk is directed to mail a copy of Orders #4 and #5 to Plaintiff at address provided in Change of Address #7 . Ordered that the Plaintiff is directed to comply with the Orders #4 and #5 on or before October 7, 2020. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 9/8/20. (JCH)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 (COPY)ATTACHMENT/AMEND MULTIPLE CONSTITUTIONAL VIOLATIONS re #1 Complaint by James Ferguson (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wld)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 Change of Address filed by James Ferguson (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wld)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to Notice of Assignment and NEFS re #1 Complaint, #2 Motion, and #3 Motion. Mail sent to James Ferguson. (RLW)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: on or before 9/21/2020, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 8/20/20. (RLW)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 9/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 8/20/20. (RLW)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by James Ferguson (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by James Ferguson (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joe Errington, South Mississippi Correctional Institution, filed by James Ferguson (Attachments: #1 ARP Forms, #2 Envelope, #3 Notice of Assignment) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferguson v. Errington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Errington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Mississippi Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?