Indian Harbor Insurance Company v. Moore et al
Plaintiff: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Defendant: Talon Contracting, LLC, ETI, Inc., Mallory Comeaux, Randall Moore, John Perry Comeaux and Apollo Industries, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00268
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Defenses by ETI, Inc., Randall Moore, Talon Contracting, LLC.(Ros, J.)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David I. Clay, II. David I. Clay, II is admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiff Indian Harbor Insurance Company in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 9/22/2020 (AB)
September 21, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for David I. Clay, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4376198) by Indian Harbor Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Held, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Thomas Kent Morrison. Thomas Kent Morrison is admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiff Indian Harbor Insurance Company in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 9/18/2020 (AB)
September 17, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Thomas Kent Morrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4374684) by Indian Harbor Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Held, Michael)
September 17, 2020 Docket Annotation as to Doc. #15. L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings by also including a brief description of any exhibits. (wld)
September 16, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Indian Harbor Insurance Company by John Perry Comeaux, Mallory Comeaux. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Peterson, Megan)
September 10, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #13: Advising attorney that instead of typing in Complaint, this docket entry should have been linked to #1 Complaint. Attorney is not required to re-file. (RLW)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to Answer Complaint. Randall Moore; Talon Contracting, LLC; and ETI, Inc.'s deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 9/24/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 9/10/2020 (AG)
September 9, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph W. Gill on behalf of ETI, Inc., Randall Moore, Talon Contracting, LLC (Gill, Joseph)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by ETI, Inc., Randall Moore, Talon Contracting, LLC (Ros, J.)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Henry Ros on behalf of ETI, Inc., Randall Moore, Talon Contracting, LLC (Ros, J.)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Talon Contracting, LLC served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Held, Michael)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Mallory Comeaux served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. (Held, Michael)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. John Perry Comeaux served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. (Held, Michael)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Reissued as to Talon Contracting, LLC. (Summons mailed to the attorney's address listed on the summons and not on the docket) (PKS)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Indian Harbor Insurance Company as to Talon Contracting, LLC. (Held, Michael)
August 25, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #6: This document was filed incorrect and should be disregarded. Attorney is advised to complete the proof of service and file the summons using the same event code. (RLW)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 **ERROR**Disregard this entry. Summons Returned Unexecuted by Indian Harbor Insurance Company as to Talon Contracting, LLC. (Held, Michael) Modified on 8/25/2020 (RLW).
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. ETI, Inc. served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. (Held, Michael)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Randall Moore served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. (Held, Michael)
August 18, 2020 Summonses for service and return emailed to attorney (RLW)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John Perry Comeaux, Mallory Comeaux, ETI, Inc., Randall Moore, Talon Contracting, LLC (RLW)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* DOCUMENT (Unredacted Complaint) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Primary Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Excess Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 REDACTED COMPLAINT against John Perry Comeaux, Mallory Comeaux, ETI, Inc., Randall Moore, Talon Contracting, LLC (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-4350280), filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Primary Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Excess Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Indian Harbor Insurance Company v. Moore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talon Contracting, LLC
Represented By: J. Henry Ros
Represented By: Joseph W. Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETI, Inc.
Represented By: J. Henry Ros
Represented By: Joseph W. Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallory Comeaux
Represented By: Megan S. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Moore
Represented By: J. Henry Ros
Represented By: Joseph W. Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Perry Comeaux
Represented By: Megan S. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apollo Industries, LLC
Represented By: J. Henry Ros
Represented By: Joseph W. Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael F. Held
Represented By: Thomas Kent Morrison - PHV
Represented By: David I. Clay - PHV, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?