Havard v. George County et al
Plaintiff: Casey Thomas Havard
Defendant: Terry Rogers and George County
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2020cv00285
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE MORE INFORMATION CONCERNING COMPLAINT: Ordered that on or before November 20, 2020, Plaintiff must file a written response to this Order. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 10/23/20. (JCH)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order.; *RESTRICTED* granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 10/20/20. (JCH)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 filed by Casey Thomas Havard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Casey Thomas Havard (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: on or before 10/19/2020, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 9/18/20. (JCH)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 10/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 9/18/20. (JCH)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Casey Thomas Havard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against George County, Terry Rogers, filed by Casey Thomas Havard. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment, #2 Envelope)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Havard v. George County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Thomas Havard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?