Missala Marine Services, Inc. v. SCB Properties, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Missala Marine Services, Inc. and Missala Realty Investments, Inc.
Defendant: SCB Properties, LLC, Chad Brady individually doing business as Brady's Steaks and Seafood and Steven Joseph Brady individually doing business as Brady's Steaks and Seafood
Case Number: 1:2020cv00297
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Discovery by Chad Brady, Steven Joseph Brady, SCB Properties, LLC (Corlew, J. Scott)
November 10, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #8: Documents filed as exhibits must include an exhibit sticker on the document identifying each exhibit (Exhibit 1 did not have a label). It is not necessary to refile. (RLW)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER staying discovery. Defendants have filed a #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Filing a motion challenging jurisdiction stays the attorney conference and disclosure requirements and all discovery, pending the Court's ruling on the motion. L.U.Civ.P. 16(b)(3)(B). Proceedings are stayed under 16(b)(3)(B) pending ruling on the Motion to Dismiss #8 . NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 11/10/20 (HM)
November 9, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by SCB Properties, LLC.(Corlew, J. Scott)
November 9, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Chad Brady, Steven Joseph Brady.(Corlew, J. Scott)
November 9, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Chad Brady, Steven Joseph Brady, SCB Properties, LLC (Corlew, J. Scott)
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Chad Brady, Steven Joseph Brady, SCB Properties, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Tax Valuation, #2 Exhibit 2-Lease, #3 Exhibit 3-DRM permit, #4 Exhibit 4-resolution, #5 Exhibit 5-application, #6 Exhibit 6-complaint, #7 Exhibit 7-MS Tidelands Act, #8 Exhibit 8-Tidelands Map, #9 Exhibit 9-survey, #10 Exhibit 10-tax assessment, #11 Exhibit 11-tax assessment, #12 Exhibit 12-GIS, #13 Exhibit 13-tax assessment, #14 Exhibit 14-assessment, #15 Exhibit 15-assessment, #16 Exhibit 16-assessment)(Corlew, J. Scott)
October 19, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants answer due 11/9/20. (HM)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. November 9, 2020 is the deadline for Defendants to file an answer or other responsive pleading. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 10/19/20 (HM)
October 19, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #7: Incorrect event chosen. The event "Extension of Time to File Answer" should have been used. Attorney is not required to re-file. (RLW)
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Chad Brady, Steven Joseph Brady, SCB Properties, LLC (Corlew, J. Scott)
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Scott Corlew on behalf of Chad Brady, Steven Joseph Brady, SCB Properties, LLC (Corlew, J. Scott)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Missala Marine Services, Inc.. SCB Properties, LLC served on 9/26/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Schwartz, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Missala Marine Services, Inc.. Steven Joseph Brady served on 9/26/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Schwartz, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Missala Marine Services, Inc.. Chad Brady served on 9/26/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Schwartz, Robert)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Chad Brady, Steven Joseph Brady, SCB Properties, LLC. (wld)
September 18, 2020 Issued summons emailed to Robert Schwartz at email address on docket. (wld)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Chad Brady, Steven Joseph Brady, SCB Properties, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4374859), filed by Missala Marine Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B-Deeds, #3 Exhibit C-Deraignment of Title, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Missala Marine Services, Inc. v. SCB Properties, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missala Marine Services, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Thomas Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missala Realty Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Thomas Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCB Properties, LLC
Represented By: J. Scott Corlew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Brady individually doing business as Brady's Steaks and Seafood
Represented By: J. Scott Corlew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Joseph Brady individually doing business as Brady's Steaks and Seafood
Represented By: J. Scott Corlew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?