National Diabetes and Obesity Research Institute of Tradition, Mississippi v. Cleveland Clinic Foundation
Plaintiff: National Diabetes and Obesity Research Institute of Tradition, Mississippi
Defendant: Cleveland Clinic Foundation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00304
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Defendant Cleveland Clinic Foundation's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 Restricted Document (Court Users and Case Participants Only). Defendant Cleveland Clinic Foundation shall file Answer by December 2, 2020. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. on November 9, 2020. (JC)
October 30, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Restricted Document (Court Users and Case Participants Only), by Cleveland Clinic Foundation (Kidd, Dean)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Restricted Document. Defendant shall file answer by 11/2/2020. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on October 20, 2020 (JAC)
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Restricted Document (Court Users and Case Participants Only), by Cleveland Clinic Foundation (Kidd, Dean)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing by National Diabetes and Obesity Research Institute of Tradition, Mississippi re #3 Order on Motion to Seal or Restrict (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, without exhibit)(McCabe, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 14643012647 (RLW)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Cleveland Clinic Foundation. (RLW)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 *RESTRICTED* DOCUMENT - Complaint against Cleveland Clinic Foundation with jury trial, filed by National Diabetes and Obesity Research Institute of Tradition, Mississippi (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended and Restated Affiliation Services Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW) Modified on 9/25/2020 to add defendant's name (RLW).
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion to Seal or Restrict Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. on 9/25/20. (RLW)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 MOTION to RESTRICT from public filed by National Diabetes and Obesity Research Institute of Tradition, Mississippi (RLW)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to RESTRICT Complaint from public by National Diabetes and Obesity Research Institute of Tradition, Mississippi (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Diabetes and Obesity Research Institute of Tradition, Mississippi v. Cleveland Clinic Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Diabetes and Obesity Research Institute of Tradition, Mississippi
Represented By: Michael Clark McCabe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland Clinic Foundation
Represented By: Dean Sterling Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?