Bernard v. DG Logistics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Christine Bernard
Defendant: DG Logistics, LLC and John and Jane Does A, B, C, and D
Case Number: 1:2020cv00308
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Christine Bernard (Gunn, Corban)
November 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Christine Bernard (Gunn, Corban)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING BRIEFING ON SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on November 10, 2020. (df)
October 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service of DG Logistcs, LLC's Initial Disclosure by DG Logistics, LLC (Vaughn, Ross)
October 13, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 5. Per L.U.Civ.R. 5.(d)(1), pre-discovery disclosure of core information should not be filed with the clerk. Only a notice of service of pre-discovery disclosure [Official Form No. 2(c)] should be filed with the Court. Attorney is directed to follow this procedure in future filings. (JCH)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Service of Disclosure by Christine Bernard (Gunn, Corban)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by DG Logistics, LLC (Vaughn, Ross)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE Amended Removal Statement Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1447 by DG Logistics, LLC (Vaughn, Ross)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE Removal Statement Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1447 by DG Logistics, LLC (Vaughn, Ross)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DG Logistics, LLC from Jackson County County Court, case number CO2020-21,106. Lower court jury demand. (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0538-4384575) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - NOR State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernard v. DG Logistics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DG Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Ross Douglas Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does A, B, C, and D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Bernard
Represented By: Corban Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?