Dejean v. Esparza et al
Plaintiff: Arthur B. Dejean
Defendant: John Does 1-5, Leonardo B. Esparza and Chale Trucking, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00317
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #6: Incorrect event chosen. Response to Order to Show Cause should only be used when an Order to Show Cause has been entered. Attorney should have used Response to Order. Attorney is not required to re-file. (RLW)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #5 ORDER requiring Defendants to file written response demonstrating diversity of citizenship. Written response due 11/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 11/4/20 (HM) by Leonardo B. Esparza, Chale Trucking, LLC filed by Leonardo B. Esparza, Chale Trucking, LLC (MacNeill, John)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER requiring Defendants to file written response demonstrating diversity of citizenship. Written response due 11/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 11/4/20 (HM)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/28/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. (AB)
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 State Court Record by Defendants Chale Trucking, LLC, Leonardo B. Esparza Volumes 1 (Henry, Matt)
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matt Evans Henry on behalf of Chale Trucking, LLC, Leonardo B. Esparza (Henry, Matt)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chale Trucking, LLC, Leonardo B. Esparza from Circuit Court of Pearl River County, Mississippi, case number 20-cv-0084-CM. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4389927) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint and Summonses, #2 Exhibit B-Notice of Service, #3 Exhibit C-Plaintiff's Resp. to Req. for Admission, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld) (Attachment 4 replaced on 10/8/2020) (wld).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dejean v. Esparza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur B. Dejean
Represented By: Christopher C. Haug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonardo B. Esparza
Represented By: John B. MacNeill
Represented By: Matt Evans Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chale Trucking, LLC
Represented By: John B. MacNeill
Represented By: Matt Evans Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?