Aldridge v. Cain et al
Plaintiff: James Aldridge
Defendant: Harold T. Cain, Lucinda K. Sloan, Julie P. Cain, HTC Elite, L.P., Ted, Evan Trace Cain GST Trust, Logan Patrick Cain GST Trust and HTC Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00321
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Louis Guirola
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Moore on behalf of Evan Trace Cain GST Trust, Logan Patrick Cain GST Trust, Lucinda K. Sloan (Moore, Michael)
November 25, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Evan Trace Cain GST Trust, Logan Patrick Cain GST Trust, Lucinda K. Sloan (Banahan, John)
November 25, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Evan Trace Cain GST Trust, Logan Patrick Cain GST Trust, Lucinda K. Sloan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Order, #2 Exhibit B- Memorandum in Support of Motion for New Trial, #3 Exhibit C-Memorandum in Support of Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law)(Banahan, John)
November 24, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by HTC Elite, L.P., HTC Enterprises, LLC.(Heidelberg, James)
November 24, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Harold T. Cain, Julie P. Cain.(Heidelberg, James)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting MOTIONs FOR TIME #4 #9 . The deadline for all Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is November 27, 2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 10/27/20 (HM)
October 26, 2020 Docket Annotation as to Doc. #9. This docket entry fails to select all filing parties. Clerks office will edit this docket entry to include all appropriate filing parties. Attorney is directed to select all filing parties in future filings. (wld)
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Harold T. Cain, Julie P. Cain, HTC Enterprises, LLC, HTC Elite, L.P. (Heidelberg, James) Modified on 10/26/2020 to add filers (wld).
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James H. Heidelberg on behalf of HTC Elite, L.P. (Heidelberg, James)
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James H. Heidelberg on behalf of HTC Enterprises, LLC (Heidelberg, James)
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James H. Heidelberg on behalf of Julie P. Cain (Heidelberg, James)
October 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James H. Heidelberg on behalf of Harold T. Cain (Heidelberg, James)
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Evan Trace Cain GST Trust, Logan Patrick Cain GST Trust, Lucinda K. Sloan (Banahan, John)
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Hawkins on behalf of James Aldridge (Hawkins, John)
October 9, 2020 Issued summonses emailed to J. Brad Pigott at email address on docket. (wld)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Harold T. Cain, Julie P. Cain, Evan Trace Cain GST Trust, HTC Elite, L.P., HTC Enterprises, LLC, Logan Patrick Cain GST Trust, Lucinda K. Sloan. (wld)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Harold T. Cain, Julie P. Cain, Evan Trace Cain GST Trust, HTC Elite, L.P., HTC Enterprises, LLC, Logan Patrick Cain GST Trust, Lucinda K. Sloan (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0538-4391108), filed by James Aldridge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aldridge v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold T. Cain
Represented By: James H. Heidelberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucinda K. Sloan
Represented By: Michael R. Moore
Represented By: John A. Banahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie P. Cain
Represented By: James H. Heidelberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC Elite, L.P.
Represented By: James H. Heidelberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted
Represented By: James H. Heidelberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Trace Cain GST Trust
Represented By: Michael R. Moore
Represented By: John A. Banahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Patrick Cain GST Trust
Represented By: Michael R. Moore
Represented By: John A. Banahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: James H. Heidelberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Aldridge
Represented By: J. Brad Pigott
Represented By: John F. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?